Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-11646

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Natalie M Cox
Case #: 2:21-ap-01101
Nature of Suit424 null
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2021
Terminated:Aug 15, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN
3672 N. RANCHO DRIVE
LAS VEGAS, NV 89130
Represented By
JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC, Plaintiff
701 SHADOW LANE, STE 150
LAS VEGAS, NV 89106
Represented By
JEFFREY R. ALBREGTS
Jeffrey R. Albregts, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Monday, August 15, 2022
47 47 court Close Adversary Case Mon 08/15 1:53 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (arv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
46 46 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Thu 07/21 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/21/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 43 Document Forwarded to BNC for Noticing
45 45 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Thu 07/21 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/21/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 41 Document Forwarded to BNC for Noticing
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
43 43 court Document Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (BNC-Adv) Tue 07/19 9:02 AM
Clerk Forwarded Document to BNC for Noticing. Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 42 Judgment.
42 42 orderad Judgment (Adv) Tue 07/19 9:01 AM
Judgment Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC.
41 41 court Document Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (BNC-Adv) Tue 07/19 8:22 AM
Clerk Forwarded Document to BNC for Noticing. Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 40 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law.
40 40 orderad Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Adv) Tue 07/19 8:19 AM
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC.
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Wed 06/08 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/08/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38 Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv)
Friday, June 03, 2022
38 38 court Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv) Fri 06/03 11:10 PM
Notice of Filing Official Transcript. Related document(s) 37 . (admin)
Related: [-]
37 37 trmis Transcript Fri 06/03 5:03 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 04/04/22. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, you may contact the Transcriber Access Transcripts, Telephone number 855-873-2223. Purchasing Party: Natalie M. Cox. Redaction Request Due By 06/24/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 07/5/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 09/1/2022. (ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
36 36 adv_misc Exhibit (Adv) Fri 04/01 5:13 PM
Exhibit of Plaintiff CHSC For Trial Filed by JEFFREY R. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC (ALBREGTS, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 2 (Part 1)
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 2 (Part 2)
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 3
Att: 5 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 4
Att: 6 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 5
Att: 7 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 6
Att: 8 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 7
Att: 9 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 8
Att: 10 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 9
Att: 11 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 10
Att: 12 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 11
Att: 13 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 12
Att: 14 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 13
Att: 15 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 14
Att: 16 Exhibit Plaintiff CHSC's Trial Exhibit 15
Friday, March 25, 2022
35 35 motion In Limine Fri 03/25 3:24 PM
Motion in Limine and To Strike Defendant's Trial Statement with Certificate of Service Filed by KRISTA N. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC (ALBREGTS, KRISTA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
34 34 adv_misc Trial Statement Wed 03/16 3:28 PM
Trial Statement with Certificate of Service Filed by JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN (mag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
33 33 adv_misc Trial Statement Thu 03/03 8:00 PM
Trial Statement with Certificate of Service Filed by KRISTA N. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC (ALBREGTS, KRISTA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit Log For Plaintiff's Trial Statement
Friday, February 25, 2022
32 32 adv_misc Declaration (ADV) Fri 02/25 4:39 PM
Declaration Of: Mailing Subpoenas to Debtor with Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY R. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC Related [+] (ALBREGTS, JEFFREY). Modified on 2/28/2022 to relate to #'s 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, 31 (Youngblood, CL)
Related: [-] 26 Notice filed by Plaintiff CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC,27 Notice filed by Plaintiff CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC,28 Notice filed by Plaintiff CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC,29 Notice filed by Plaintiff CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC,30 Notice filed by Plaintiff CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC,31 Notice filed by Plaintiff CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC.
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
31 31 notice Notice (Adv) Tue 02/01 8:22 PM
Notice of Subpoena To Georgia Hope, Inc. with Certificate of Service Filed by KRISTA N. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC (ALBREGTS, KRISTA)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice (Adv) Tue 02/01 8:09 PM
Notice of Subpoena To New Directions Homes For Youth, Inc. with Certificate of Service Filed by KRISTA N. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC (ALBREGTS, KRISTA)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice (Adv) Tue 02/01 7:57 PM
Notice of Subpoena To Family Tree Health Care Systems, Inc. with Certificate of Service Filed by KRISTA N. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC (ALBREGTS, KRISTA)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice (Adv) Tue 02/01 7:44 PM
Notice of Subpoena To A New Day Adult Daycare and Outpatient Treatment Center, LLC with Certificate of Service Filed by KRISTA N. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC (ALBREGTS, KRISTA)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice (Adv) Tue 02/01 7:29 PM
Notice of Subpoena To A New Day Community Health Center, Inc. with Certificate of Service Filed by KRISTA N. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC (ALBREGTS, KRISTA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
26 26 notice Notice (Adv) Thu 01/13 4:13 PM
Notice of Subpoena Issued To Ryan A. Andersen, Esq. Filed by KRISTA N. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC (ALBREGTS, KRISTA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
25 25 notice Notice (Adv) Fri 01/07 3:59 PM
Notice of Subpoena To Peter Angulo Filed by KRISTA N. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC (ALBREGTS, KRISTA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
24 24 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Wed 12/08 2:44 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment with Certificate of Service Filed by H STAN JOHNSON on behalf of JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN Related [+](JOHNSON, H)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record.
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
23 23 order Withdraw As Attorney of Record (Adv) Tue 12/07 2:15 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record Related [+] H STAN JOHNSON terminated from the case. (arv)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
22 22 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Tue 11/09 9:45 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 16 Notice filed by Plaintiff CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC.
Monday, November 08, 2021
21 21 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Mon 11/08 1:22 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by H STAN JOHNSON on behalf of JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN Related [+] (JOHNSON, H)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Defendant JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN,19 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Defendant JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN,20 Order on Motion for Order Shortening Time.
Friday, November 05, 2021
20 20 order Shortening Time (Adv) Fri 11/05 3:45 PM
Order Granting Motion for Order Shortening Time Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 11/18/2021 at 11:30 AM at Remote. (arv)
Related: [-] 19 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Defendant JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN.
19 19 4 pgs motion Order Shortening Time (Adv) Fri 11/05 3:12 PM
Motion for Order Shortening Time with Certificate of Service Filed by H STAN JOHNSON on behalf of JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN Related [+] (JOHNSON, H)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Defendant JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN.
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
18 18 motion Withdraw as Attorney of Record (Adv) Fri 11/05 3:07 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record with Certificate of Service Filed by H STAN JOHNSON on behalf of JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN (JOHNSON, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
17 17 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Fri 11/05 10:58 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Defendant JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN,15 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Defendant JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN.
Thursday, November 04, 2021
16 16 notice Notice (Adv) Thu 11/04 7:51 PM
Notice of Non-Opposition To Motion To Withdraw As Counsel For Defendant In The Adversary Case with Certificate of Service Filed by KRISTA N. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC Related [+](ALBREGTS, KRISTA)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Defendant JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN,15 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Defendant JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN.
15 15 4 pgs motion Order Shortening Time (Adv) Thu 11/04 4:38 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time TO HEAR DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT IN THE ADVERSARY CASE ON AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME with Certificate of Service Filed by H STAN JOHNSON on behalf of JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN Related [+] (JOHNSON, H)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Defendant JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN.
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 Copy of Motion to Withdraw
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 Dec of HSJ in Support of OST
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 3 Consent of Counsel
14 14 motion Withdraw as Attorney of Record (Adv) Thu 11/04 4:29 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record with Certificate of Service Filed by H STAN JOHNSON on behalf of JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN (JOHNSON, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 Dec of HSJ in Support of Motion to Withdraw
13 13 orderad Set Hearing (Adv) Thu 11/04 4:26 PM
Order to Set Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/17/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Trial date set for 4/4/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC.
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
12 12 adv_misc Standard Discovery Plan/Request for Waiver of Filing Discovery Plan Wed 09/15 1:15 PM
Discovery Plan with Certificate of Service Filed by KRISTA N. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC (ALBREGTS, KRISTA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/19 9:07 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by H STAN JOHNSON on behalf of JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN (JOHNSON, H)
Related: [-] 1
10 10 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Thu 08/19 8:54 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 9 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN.
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/18 3:34 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by H STAN JOHNSON on behalf of JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN (JOHNSON, H)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
8 8 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Tue 08/17 12:41 PM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 7 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN.
Monday, August 16, 2021
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/16 2:56 PM
Answer to Complaint OBJECTING TO DISCHARGE PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 727(a)(3)-(6) Related [+] Filed by H STAN JOHNSON on behalf of JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN (JOHNSON, H)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, July 26, 2021
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/26 3:55 PM
Summons Service Executed on JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN 7/21/2021 Filed by JEFFREY R. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC Related [+] (ALBREGTS, JEFFREY). Modified on 7/27/2021 to relate to #'s 1, 5 (Youngblood, CL)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC,5 Summons Issued.
Thursday, July 15, 2021
5 5 court Summons Issued Thu 07/15 9:20 AM
Summons Issued on JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN (mag)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Thu 07/15 9:19 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/28/2021 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mag)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC.
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
3 3 cmp Request to Issue Summons Wed 07/14 4:41 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN. Filed by JEFFREY R. ALBREGTS on behalf of CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC (ALBREGTS, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Wed 07/14 3:49 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 21-01101 nmc) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 20270093, fee amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (ALBREGTS, JEFFREY) (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/14 3:45 PM
Adversary case 21-01101 Complaint Adversary Objecting to Discharge Pursuant to 11 USC subsec 727(a)(3)-(6) Filed by CHARLESTON HEIGHTS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC vs. JOHN OSHIFODUNRIN Fee Amount $350. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud, 424 Obj/Revocation Discharge 727)(ALBREGTS, JEFFREY) Modified on 7/15/2021 to add additional nature of suit (Hannan, KS).
Related: [-]