In re Stable Road Acquisition Corp. Securities Litigation
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-05744 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 11, 2022 1:11 AM PST |
Consol Plaintiff
Martin Hall
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Drew Depoy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Kabot
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Juan Manuel Quiroga
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fred Kennedy
|
|
Defendant
James Hofmockel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dawn Harms
|
|
Defendant
SRC NI Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stable Road Acquisition Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Norris
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Momentus Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mikhail Kokorich
|
|
Movant
Blackridge Capital Alliance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
James Cramer
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Dave Durocher
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Yoko Fukuda
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Hartmut Haenisch
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Paul Meozzi
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Keith Jensen
Terminated: 10/21/2021
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
213 | 213
transcript
-Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Wed 04/24 3:04 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Momentus Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Christine von Seeburg and Jennifer Ilas at christine.vonseeburg@bakermckenzie.com; jennifer.ilas@bakermckenzie.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Goodman, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
212 | 212
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 04/23 1:03 PM
ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND by Judge John F. Walter. This Order approving the proposed Plan of Allocation incorporates by reference the definitions in the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement dated August 18, 2023 and all capitalized terms not otherwise defined herein shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Stipulation. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) |
|
211 | 211
4
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 12:56 PM
ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES by Judge John F. Walter. Lead Counsel are hereby awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of 25% of the Settlement Fund and $101,115.83 in reimbursement of Lead Counsel's litigation expenses (which fees and expenses shall be paid from the Settlement Fund), which sums the Court finds to be fair and reasonable. Lead Plaintiff Hartmut Haenisch is hereby awarded $10,000.00 from the Settlement Fund as reimbursement for his reasonable costs and expenses directly related to his representation of the Settlement Class. (iv) |
|
210 | 210
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 04/23 12:53 PM
JUDGMENT APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge John F. Walter. SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS. (iv) |
|
209 | 209
30+
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 12:43 PM
STATEMENT OF DECISION RE: (I) LEAD PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION; AND (II) LEAD COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES by Judge John F. Walter. The Court grants the motion for: (1) final approval of the proposed Settlement; and (2) approval of the proposed plan of allocation of the proceeds of the Settlement. The Court also grants Lead Counsel's motion for an award of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of Litigation Expenses. The Court overrules the Objection. (iv) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
208 | 208
minutes
Motion Hearing Settlement Attorney Fees
Tue 04/23 12:40 PM
MINUTES OF LEAD PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION198 Filed 3/18/24; LEAD COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES200 Filed 3/18/24 held before Judge John F. Walter. Court hears oral argument and, for the reasons stated on the record, the Court grants: Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation. Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
207 | 207
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 04/17 1:24 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation 198 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses 200(Sadler, Casey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - Plaintiff's Proposed Statement of Decision |