Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-00180
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2021
Last checked: Friday Jul 16, 2021 2:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Jerome Thomas Watkins (1)
Represented By
David Miles Brissette
The Law Offices Of Gill & Brissette
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Laura Montes-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/16/2021 3:46 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
Arrest of Jerome Thomas Watkins (jah) [4:21-mj-00297-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jerome Thomas Watkins (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (jah) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/28/2021) (jah). [4:21-mj-00297-BJ]
Related: [-]
2 2 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney David Miles Brissette for Jerome Thomas Watkins appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/28/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00297-BJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Jerome Thomas Watkins held on 4/28/2021. Date of Arrest: 4/28/2021; Deft executed financial affidavit; o/appointing counsel entered; Rule 5(f) admonishment given; Preliminary & Detention Hearing set 5/3/21 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; o/temp detention entered; deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Alex Lewis; Defense - David Miles Brissette. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Kirksey.) (jah) [4:21-mj-00297-BJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jerome Thomas Watkins (jah) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/28/2021) (jah). [4:21-mj-00297-BJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Jerome Thomas Watkins: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/28/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00297-BJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Jerome Thomas Watkins (jah) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/28/2021) (jah). [4:21-mj-00297-BJ]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Jerome Thomas Watkins. Detention & Preliminary Hearing set for 5/3/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/28/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00297-BJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
8 8 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Preliminary & Detention Hearing NOT HELD on 5/3/2021 as to Jerome Thomas Watkins. Deft waives both hearings at this time; Court finds PC; o/detention pending trial entered; deft continued in custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - David Miles Brissette. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Mouret.) (jah) [4:21-mj-00297-BJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting6 Motion for Detention as to Jerome Thomas Watkins (1) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/3/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00297-BJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
10 10 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Jerome Thomas Watkins (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [4:21-mj-00297-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
11 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting10 Motion to Continue as to Jerome Thomas Watkins (1)continued until July 15, 2021 for the reasons stated in the joint motion and because the ends of justice served by the granting of such continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. [see 18 USC 3161 (h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv) and (h)(7(B)(I). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/21/2021) (edm) [4:21-mj-00297-BJ] (Entered: 05/21/2021)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
12 12 INDICTMENT with forfeiture notice as to Jerome Thomas Watkins (1) count(s) 1,2,3,4. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (tln)
Related: [-]
14 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Jerome Thomas Watkins: Arraignment set for 7/21/2021 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. Attorneys and Defendant to be in the courtroom 15 minutes prior to the hearing start time. Waivers of arraignment are encouraged. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 7/14/2021) (jah)
Related: [-]