Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:21-cv-05396
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2021
Case in other court:Mississippi Southern, 1:21-cv-00224
Last checked: Monday Jan 10, 2022 12:50 AM PST
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Diane Harwood
Represented By
W. Thomas McCraney, III
Mccraney Montagnet & Quin, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, July 22, 2021
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 07/22 9:37 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [Plaintiff Diane Harwood, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 07/22 9:36 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [Plaintiff Diane Harwood, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/22 9:34 AM
Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [Plaintiff Diane Harwood, et al.] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 07/15 8:48 AM
Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00224. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Thu 07/15 8:56 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Southern District of Mississippi, 1:21-cv-00224-HSO-JCG Harwood v. Monsanto Company, opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-05396-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 277 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
5 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER 277 In Re Roundup Products Liability Litigation MDL 2741: transferring this case to the Northern District of California and assigned to Judge Chhabria. (RLW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 01, 2021
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diane Harwood. Monsanto Company served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (McCraney, W.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
3 3 Letter sent to MDL Clerk with docket entries and complaint/notice of removal. (RLW)
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (wld)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4593173), filed by Diane Harwood.(wld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Summons issued and emailed to W. Thomas McCraney III at email address on docket. (wld)
Related: [-]