Florida Northern District Court
Judge:T Kent Wetherell II
Referred: Zachary C Bolitho
Case #: 3:21-cv-00907
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2021
Terminated:Jan 19, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 12, 2022 3:46 AM EST
Defendant
JAMES PASCHKE
Represented By
CRAIG ANTHONY WIRTH
Sriplaw - Boca Raton Fl
contact info
JOEL BENJAMIN ROTHMAN
Sriplaw Pllc - Boca Raton Fl
contact info
ANGELA MARIA NIEVES
Sriplaw - Boca Raton Fl
contact info
Defendant
PASCHKE CONSULTING INC
Represented By
CRAIG ANTHONY WIRTH
Sriplaw - Boca Raton Fl
contact info
JOEL BENJAMIN ROTHMAN
Sriplaw Pllc - Boca Raton Fl
contact info
ANGELA MARIA NIEVES
Sriplaw - Boca Raton Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
SERRALA US CORPORATION
Represented By
MATTHEW C MOSCHELLA
Sherin And Lodgen Llp - Boston Ma
contact info
MICHAEL S VITALE
Baker & Hostetler Llp - Orlando Fl
contact info
ERIN MICHELLE SALES
Baker & Hostetler Llp - Orlando Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, January 19, 2023
140 140 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/19 10:19 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Based on the parties' stipulation of dismissal with prejudice (Doc. 139 ), it is ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the Clerk shall close the case file. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 01/19/2023. (alb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 01/19 8:17 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re:139 Stipulation of Dismissal. (alb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
139 139 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/18 12:36 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by SERRALA US CORPORATION. (GUENTHER, DANIEL)
Related: [-]