Oklahoma Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Janice D Loyd
Case #: 5:21-bk-11926
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2021
Terminated:Mar 07, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Nov 10, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Pelco Structural, L.L.C.
320 W 18th St
Edmond, OK 73013-3628
Represented By
Clayton D Ketter
Phillips Murrah PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
United States Trustee 215 Dean A. McGee Ave., 4th Floor
Oklahoma City, OK 73102


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Thursday, March 09, 2023
257 257 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/09 11:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 03/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 256 Final Decree - chp 11 & 12
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
256 256 order Final Decree - chp 11 & 12 Tue 03/07 12:03 PM
Final Decree. Case has been Fully Administered. Case is Closed. Signed by Judge Loyd. Time signed: 10:26 cc: Matrix Service by sboa Date: 3/7/2023 (sboa, ca)
Related: [-]