New York Southern District Court
Case #: 7:21-cr-00441
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Apr 09, 2023 1:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Onitayo Are (5)
Represented By
Michael Kennedy Burke
Hodges Walsh & Burke LLP
contact info
Defendant
Indigo Grant (6)
Represented By
Ilana Haramati
Meister Seelig & Fein LLP
contact info
Joseph A. Vita
Joseph A. Vita
contact info
Daniel Steven Parker
Parker & Carmody
contact info
Manubir S. Arora
Arora Law Firm
contact info
Henry Edward Mazurek
Meister Seelig & Fein, LLP
contact info
Jason Immanuel Ser
Meister Seelig & Fein
contact info
Kerry Andrew Lawrence
Law Office Of Kerry A. Lawrence, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Antoine Koen (3)
Represented By
Howard Evan Tanner
Howard Tanner
contact info
Defendant
Patricia Konco (7)
Represented By
Francis Lee O'Reilly
Law Office Of Francis L. Oreilly
contact info
Francis J. O'Reilly
Francis J. Oreilly
contact info
Defendant
Darren Lindsay (1)
Represented By
John S. Wallenstein
Law Offices Of John S. Wallenstein
contact info
Defendant
Robert Ojeda (4)
Represented By
Steven E. Lewis
Dunnington, Bartholow & Miller, L.L.P.
contact info
Stephen R. Lewis
Stephens, Baroni, Reilly & Lewis, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Patrick Chellel (8)
Represented By
Bruce D. Koffsky
Koffsky & Felsen, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nicholas Sutherland Bradley
Doj-Usao
contact info
Jennifer Ong
Doj-Usao
contact info
Kaiya Mary Alexandri Arroyo
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Dorian Byrd (2)
Terminated: 01/04/2022
Represented By
Richard David Willstatter
Green & Willstatter
contact info
Steven David Feldman
Mcgonigle P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ap)
Related: [-]
INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Darren Lindsay, Dorian Byrd, Antoine Koen, Robert Ojeda, Onitayo Are, Indigo Grant, Patricia Konco. (ap)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF as to Darren Lindsay, Dorian Byrd, Antoine Koen, Robert Ojeda, Onitayo Are, Indigo Grant, Patricia Konco. (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Initial Appearance as to Onitayo Are held on 7/14/2021. Arraignment as to Onitayo Are (5) Count 1,6,7 held on 7/14/2021. Defendant present with Michael Burke. AUSA: Nicholas Bradley. The defendant was advised of his rights and the charges against him. Financial affidavit approved. Michael Burke appointed to represent the defendant. The defendant was arraigned on the Indictment, waived public reading, and entered a not guilty plea. The matter is assigned to Judge Karas. The speedy trial time has been excluded until the first pretrial conference before the district judge, not to exceed July 28, 2021. Any further exclusion of time must be made to the District Judge. Defendant detained on consent without prejudice. Detention hearing scheduled for 7/16/21 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 421. (Bond Hearing set for 7/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 421, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Plea entered by Onitayo Are (5) Count 1,6,7 Not Guilty. (ap)
Related: [-]
Case as to Darren Lindsay, Dorian Byrd, Antoine Koen, Robert Ojeda, Onitayo Are, Indigo Grant, Patricia Konco REASSIGNED to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Initial Appearance as to Dorian Byrd held on 7/14/2021. Arraignment as to Dorian Byrd (2) Count 1-2,3,4,5 held on 7/14/2021. Defendant present with Richard Willstatter. AUSA: Nicholas Bradley. The defendant was advised of his rights and the charges against him. Financial affidavit approved. Richard Willstatter appointed to represent the defendant for todays purposes only. Steven Feldman appointed to represent the defendant for the remainder of the case. The defendant was arraigned on the Indictment, waived public reading, and entered a not guilty plea. The matter is assigned to Judge Karas. The speedy trial time has been excluded until the first pretrial conference before the district judge, not to exceed July 28, 2021. Any further exclusion of time must be made to the District Judge. Defendant detained on consent without prejudice. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Plea entered by Dorian Byrd (2) Count 1-2,3,4,5 Not Guilty. (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Initial Appearance as to Indigo Grant held on 7/14/2021. Arraignment as to Indigo Grant (6) Count 1,6,7 held on 7/14/2021. Defendant present with Joseph Vita. AUSA: Nicholas Bradley. The defendant was advised of her rights and the charges against her. Financial affidavit approved. Joseph Vita appointed to represent the defendant for today's purposes only. The defendant was arraigned on the Indictment, waived public reading, and entered a not guilty plea. The matter is assigned to Judge Karas. The speedy trial time has been excluded until the first pretrial conference before the district judge, not to exceed July 28, 2021. Any further exclusion of time must be made to the District Judge. Bail arguments heard. Defendant released on bail. See Appearance Bond and Order Setting Conditions of Release. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Plea entered by Indigo Grant (6) Count 1,6,7 Not Guilty. (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Initial Appearance as to Antoine Koen held on 7/14/2021. Arraignment as to Antoine Koen (3) Count 1,4,5,6,7 held on 7/14/2021. Defendant present with Howard Tanner. AUSA: Nicholas Bradley. The defendant was advised of his rights and the charges against him. Financial affidavit approved. Howard Tanner appointed to represent the defendant. The defendant was arraigned on the Indictment, waived public reading, and entered a not guilty plea. The matter is assigned to Judge Karas. The speedy trial time has been excluded until the first pretrial conference before the district judge, not to exceed July 28, 2021. Any further exclusion of time must be made to the District Judge. Defendant detained on consent without prejudice. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Plea entered by Antoine Koen (3) Count 1,4,5,6,7 Not Guilty. (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Initial Appearance as to Patricia Konco held on 7/14/2021. Arraignment as to Patricia Konco (7) Count 1,6,7 held on 7/14/2021. Defendant present with Francis O'Reilly. AUSA: Nicholas Bradley. The defendant was advised of her rights and the charges against her. Financial affidavit approved. Francis O'Reilly appointed to represent the defendant. The defendant was arraigned on the Indictment, waived public reading, and entered a not guilty plea. The matter is assigned to Judge Karas. The speedy trial time has been excluded until the first pretrial conference before the district judge, not to exceed July 28, 2021. Any further exclusion of time must be made to the District Judge. Defendant released on agreed-upon conditions of bail. See Appearance Bond and Order Setting Conditions of Release. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Plea entered by Patricia Konco (7) Count 1,6,7 Not Guilty. (ap)
Related: [-]
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Patricia Konco. APPROVED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Initial Appearance as to Darren Lindsay held on 7/14/2021. Arraignment as to Darren Lindsay (1) Count 1-2,3,4,5,6,7 held on 7/14/2021. Defendant present with John Wallenstein. AUSA: Nicholas Bradley. The defendant was advised of his rights and the charges against him. Financial affidavit approved. John Wallenstein appointed to represent the defendant. The defendant was arraigned on the Indictment, waived public reading, and entered a not guilty plea. The matter is assigned to Judge Karas. The speedy trial time has been excluded until the first pretrial conference before the district judge, not to exceed July 28, 2021. Any further exclusion of time must be made to the District Judge. Defendant detained on consent without prejudice. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Plea entered by Darren Lindsay (1) Count 1-2,3,4,5,6,7 Not Guilty. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy:Initial Appearance as to Robert Ojeda held on 7/14/2021. Arraignment as to Robert Ojeda (4) Count 1,4,5 held on 7/14/2021. Defendant present with Stephen Lewis. AUSA: Nicholas Bradley. The defendant was advised of his rights and the charges against him. Financial affidavit approved. Stephen Lewis appointed to represent the defendant. The defendant was arraigned on the Indictment, waived public reading, and entered a not guilty plea. The matter is assigned to Judge Karas. The speedy trial time has been excluded until the first pretrial conference before the district judge, not to exceed July 28, 2021. Any further exclusion of time must be made to the District Judge. Bail arguments heard. Defendant detained based on risk of flight and danger. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Plea entered by Robert Ojeda (4) Count 1,4,5 Not Guilty. (ap)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1-2,3,4,5,6,7, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1-2,3,4,5, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 1,4,5,6,7, Sealed Defendant 4 (4) count(s) 1,4,5, Sealed Defendant 5 (5) count(s) 1,6,7, Sealed Defendant 6 (6) count(s) 1,6,7, Sealed Defendant 7 (7) count(s) 1,6,7. (ap)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Order to Unseal Case as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3, Sealed Defendant 4, Sealed Defendant 5, Sealed Defendant 6, Sealed Defendant 7.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 7/14/2021) (ap)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Onitayo Are. APPROVED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (ap)
Related: [-]
4 4 MEDICAL ORDER as to Onitayo Are. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 7/14/2021) (ap)
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dorian Byrd. APPROVED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (ap)
Related: [-]
6 6 8 pgs APPEARANCE BOND SECURED Personal Recognizance Bond Entered as to Indigo Grant in amount of $200,000.00, secured by: 2 FRP by 7/21/21. The agreement of the defendant and each surety to forfeit the following cash or other property (describe the cash or other property, including claims on it - such as a lien, mortgage, or loan - and attach proof of ownership and value): The defendant's home in GA by 7 /28/21. If this bond is secured by real property, documents to protect the secured interest may be filed of record. The defendant must: submit to supervision by and report for supervision to the PRETRIAL SERVICES FOR As Directed; surrender any passport to: PRETRIAL SERVICES; not obtain a passport or other international travel document. abide by the following restrictions on personal association, residence, or travel: SDNY/EDNY /NDGA and points in-between for purposes of court appearances and attorney visits only. avoid all contact, directly or indirectly, with any person who is or may be a victim or witness in the investigation or prosecution, including: co-defendants unless in the presence of counsel; get medical or psychiatric treatment: mental health evaluation and treatment as directed by Pretrial; not possess a firearm, destructive device, or other weapon. Not use or unlawfully possess a narcotic drug or other controlled substances defined in 21 U.S.C. § 802, unless prescribed by a licensed medical practitioner. participate in one of the following location restriction programs and comply with its requirements as directed. Curfew. You are restricted to your residence every day from 7pm to 7am. ADDITIONAL CONDITIONS OF RELEASE: submit to the following location monitoring technology and comply with its requirements as directed: GPS. The defendant is permitted to self-install the location monitoring equipment. The defendant is directed to report to Pretrial Services in NDGA by 7/16/21. (ap)
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Antoine Koen. APPROVED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (ap)
Related: [-]
8 8 APPEARANCE BOND SECURED Personal Recognizance Bond Entered as to Patricia Konco in amount of $ 200,000.00; secured by: 2 FRP; The agreement of the defendant and each surety to forfeit the following cash or other property: Defendant's parents' house by July 28, 2021 If this bond is secured by real property, documents to protect the secured interest may be filed of record. ADDITIONAL CONDITIONS OF RELEASE: The defendant must: submit to supervision by and report for supervision to the PRETRIAL SERVICES As Directed; surrender any passport to: PRETRIAL SERVICES; not obtain a passport or other international travel document; abide by the following restrictions on personal association, residence, or travel: SDNY/EDNY and the DCT for legal visits only ) avoid all contact, directly or indirectly, with any person who is or may be a victim or witness in the investigation or prosecution, including: co-defendants unless in the presence of counsel; not possess a firearm, destructive device, or other weapon; not use or unlawfully possess a narcotic drug or other controlled substances defined in 21 U.S.C. § 802, unless prescribed by a licensed medical practitioner; submit to testing for a prohibited substance if required by the pretrial services office or supervising officer. Testing may be used with random frequency and may include urine testing, the wearing of a sweat patch, a remote alcohol testing system, and/or any form of prohibited substance screening or testing. The defendant must not obstruct, attempt to obstruct, or tamper with the efficiency and accuracy of prohibited substance screening or testing; participate in a program of inpatient or outpatient substance abuse therapy and counseling if directed by the pretrial services office or supervising officer. participate in one of the following location restriction programs and comply with its requirements as directed. Curfew. You are restricted to your residence every day from 7p.m. to 7a.m. ADDITIONAL CONDITIONS OF RELEASE: submit to the following location monitoring technology and comply with its requirements as directed: GPS. The defendant is permitted to self-install the location monitoring equipment. (ap)
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Darren Lindsay. APPROVED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (ap)
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Robert Ojeda. APPROVED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (ap)
Related: [-]
11 11 MEDICAL ORDER as to Robert Ojeda. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 7/14/2021) (ap)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs RULE 5(F) ORDER as to Darren Lindsay, Dorian Byrd, Antoine Koen, Robert Ojeda, Onitayo Are, Indigo Grant, Patricia Konco. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 7/14/2021) (ap)
Related: [-]