California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:21-cv-01197
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jan 15, 2022 1:30 AM PST
Defendant
Prosites Inc.
Represented By
Ellen E Cohen
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Jason M Yang
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Steve Tran
Represented By
Neama Rahmani
West Coast Trial Lawyers Aplc
contact info
Ronald Leonardo Zambrano
West Coast Employment Lawyers
contact info
Sandra Acosta Tello
West Coast Employment Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 16, 2022
29 29 stip Dismiss Case Mon 05/16 4:05 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Plaintiff Steve Tran.(Zambrano, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 02, 2021
28 28 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Fri 12/03 11:11 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 3/4/2022. (yl)
Related: [-]
27 27 14 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/03 11:04 AM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. Last day to Conduct Settlement Conference: 3/4/2022; Deadline for Initial Designation of Expert Witnesses: 7/1/2022; Deadline for Designation of Rebuttal Expert Witnesses: 7/15/2022; All Discovery Cut-Off (including hearing of discovery motions): 7/29/2022; Dispositive Motion Hearing Cut-Off: 10/7/2022; Deadline for Hearing on Motions in Limine: 11/18/2022 at 9:00 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference: 11/18/2022; at 11:00 a.m. Jury Trial: 12/12/2022 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 11/16 4:47 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on November 19, 2021 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 11/09 9:12 AM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has received the parties' "Joint Rule 26(f) Report" (the "Report") [ECF No.24 ], filed in response to the Court's OSC [ECF No.23 ]. The Court hereby accepts the Report and orders the OSC DISCHARGED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
24 24 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 11/08 2:55 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Defendant Prosites Inc... (Cohen, Ellen)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 11/08 1:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed Against Plaintiffs and Defendant's Counsel for Failure to File a Rule 26(f) Report by Judge John W. Holcomb. Despite the Court's reminders, the parties have not submitted a Joint Rule 26(f) Report. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS counsel for Plaintiff, Neama Rahmani and Ronald Leonardo Zambrano, and counsel for Defendant, Ellen E. Cohen and Jason M. Yang, to show cause why they should not each be sanctioned in the amount of $500 for their failure to file a timely Joint Rule 26(f) report. Counsel shall respond in writing to this Order to Show Cause by Monday, November 15, 2021, at 12:00 noon. Counsel's failure to respond-or counsel's filing of an inadequate response-may result in the imposition of additional sanctions. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/18 3:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb21 It is ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from October 29, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. to November 19, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. The Parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer on the topics required by Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 21 days prior to the Scheduling Conference, and to file a joint report 14 days prior to the Scheduling Conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
21 21 stip Continue Wed 10/13 3:36 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from October 29, 2021 to November 19, 2021 filed by Defendant Prosites Inc..(Cohen, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Continuance of Scheduling Conference
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
20 20 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 09/15 3:04 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
19 19 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 09/08 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Prosites Inc., identifying Plaintiff Steve Tran & Defendant Prosites, Inc.. (Attorney Ellen E Cohen added to party Prosites Inc.(pty:dft))(Cohen, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
18 18 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Fri 09/03 5:55 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)16 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,17 by Clerk of Court. Counsel is ordered to file a Notice of Interested Parties forthwith by no later than SEPTEMBER 8, 2021. (yl)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 09/03 5:51 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 08/30 9:59 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)4 filed by Defendant Prosites Inc..(Attorney Jason M Yang added to party Prosites Inc.(pty:dft))(Yang, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 08/24 1:19 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ronald Leonardo Zambrano counsel for Plaintiff Steve Tran. Sandra Acosta Tello is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Steve Tran. (Zambrano, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
14 14 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 07/30 4:08 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 07/26 12:10 PM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Steve Tran, upon Defendant Prosites Inc. served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Zambrano, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
12 12 service Summons Issued Thu 07/22 5:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)4 as to Defendant Prosites Inc.. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
11 11 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 07/21 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Steve Tran, identifying None. (Zambrano, Ronald)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Summons Request Wed 07/21 10:14 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,9 filed by Plaintiff Steve Tran. (Zambrano, Ronald)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Deficiency in Summons Wed 07/21 8:41 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 07/21 8:39 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 07/21 8:37 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 07/21 8:36 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 07/21 8:36 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (esa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
4 4 21 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 07/20 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31662738 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Steve Tran. (Attorney Ronald Leonardo Zambrano added to party Steve Tran(pty:pla))(Zambrano, Ronald)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 07/20 3:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Steve Tran. (Zambrano, Ronald)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Tue 07/20 2:55 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form,1 filed by Plaintiff Steve Tran. (Zambrano, Ronald)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 07/20 8:11 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. (esa)
Related: [-]