Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Pacific Premier Bank
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-00833
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-00833
North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Joseph N Callaway |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-00074 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 22, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Pacific Premier Bank
17901 Von Karman Avenue Suite 1200
Irvine, CA 92614 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
543 Country Club Drive Suite B
Wood Ranch, CA 93065 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 07 2021
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. Judge Entering Opinion: JNC (RE: related document(s)11 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Pacific Premier Bank). (Crossman, Ahronda) |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 10/22 10:16 AM
Adversary Case 5:21-ap-74 Closed (Gibson, Aileen) |
||
Wednesday, October 20, 2021 | ||
court
Returned Mail (Text)
Wed 10/20 7:32 AM
Notification of Returned Mail by BNC addressed to Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Gibson, Aileen) |
||
Saturday, October 09, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Sun 10/10 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 10/09/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 07, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
9
pgs
order
Written Opinion
Thu 10/07 4:17 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. Judge Entering Opinion: JNC . (Crossman, Ahronda) |
|
Tuesday, September 14, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
audio
Tue 09/14 5:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [09/14/2021 02:03:12 PM]. File Size [ 14326 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:42:50 ]. (admin) |
|
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
utility
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar
Fri 09/10 7:28 AM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar (Payne, Lisa) |
||
Thursday, September 09, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
answerap
Response
Thu 09/09 11:01 AM
Response to filed by Jill Walters on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank (Walters, Jill) |
|
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
utility
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar
Wed 09/08 8:00 AM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar (Payne, Lisa) |
||
Tuesday, September 07, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
answerap
Response
Tue 09/07 8:20 PM
Response to filed by Thomas W. Waldrep Jr. on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Waldrep, Thomas) |
|
Friday, August 20, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Hearing
Sat 08/21 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 08/20/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 18, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
court
Hearing Set (Motion)
Wed 08/18 4:04 PM
Notice of Hearing . Hearing scheduled for 9/14/2021 at 02:00 PM at Zoom Hearing. Responses Due: 9/7/21 (Payne, Lisa) |
|
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
24
pgs
misc
Memorandum of Law
Mon 08/16 10:02 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Jill Walters on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank . (Walters, Jill) **Corrective Entry: Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Jill Walters, Paul Malingagio on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank.** Modified on 8/17/2021 (Skinner, Donna) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Adversary
Mon 08/16 10:00 PM
Motion to Dismiss filed by Jill Walters on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank. (Walters, Jill) **Corrective Entry: Motion to Dismiss filed by Jill Walters, Paul Malingagio on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank.** Modified on 8/17/2021 (Skinner, Donna) |
|
Friday, July 23, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
admis
Client Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/23 12:52 PM
Client Disclosure Statement filed by Jill Walters on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank. (Walters, Jill) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Notice of Special Appearance
Fri 07/23 12:49 PM
Notice of Special Appearance (Paul Malingagio) filed by Jill Walters on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank. (Walters, Jill) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Special Appearance
Fri 07/23 12:45 PM
Notice of Special Appearance (Alan Feld) filed by Jill Walters on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank. (Walters, Jill) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Special Appearance
Fri 07/23 12:42 PM
Notice of Special Appearance (Theodore A. Cohen) filed by Jill Walters on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank. (Walters, Jill) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/23 12:36 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jill Walters on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank. (Walters, Jill) |
|
utility
Terminate Deadline (Public)
Fri 07/23 10:00 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated. Amended Summons Service Executed Filed. (Gibson, Aileen) |
||
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 07/22 5:11 PM
Amended/Amendment to Summons Service Executed on Pacific Premier Bank 7/22/2021. filed by Thomas W. Waldrep Jr. on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Waldrep, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, July 20, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
court
Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP)
Tue 07/20 3:45 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Thomas W. Waldrep Jr./Daren R. Brinkman. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The insured depository institution was not served by certified mail to the attention of an officer as required by Rule 7004(h) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (Pacific Premier Bank). Upon completion of proper service, a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Due by 7/30/2021. (Gibson, Aileen) |
|
Monday, July 19, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 07/19 4:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Pacific Premier Bank 7/19/2021. filed by Thomas W. Waldrep Jr. on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Waldrep, Thomas) |
|
Friday, July 16, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Fri 07/16 4:44 PM
Summons Issued on Pacific Premier Bank Answer Due 08/16/2021 (Waldrep, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/16 4:44 PM
Adversary case 21-00074 5. Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Pacific Premier Bank (Fee Paid) (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Waldrep, Thomas) |