Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-36314

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:21-ap-03666
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2021
Terminated:Feb 21, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
LOGIX Communications, LP
2950 North Loop West 10th Floor
Houston, TX 77092
Represented By
LOGIX Communications, LP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel H. Golden, as Liquidating Trustee of the DFC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Daniel H. Golden
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
court Case Reassigned-Adversary Tue 10/17 12:41 PM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 21, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/21 4:05 PM
Adversary Case 4:21-ap-3666 Closed. (emiller)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 11/12 1:08 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Daniel H. Golden(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/28 11:21 AM
Summons Service Executed on LOGIX Communications, LP 7/27/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
5 5 court Summons Issued Thu 07/22 5:14 PM
Summons Issued on LOGIX Communications, LP Date Issued 7/22/2021. (hcar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/21 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
3 3 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Wed 07/21 11:54 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on LOGIX Communications, LP dba LOGIX FIber Networks. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
crditcrd none Mon 07/19 3:15 PM
Receipt of Complaint 21-03666 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23156711. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 18, 2021
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Sun 07/18 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Thu 07/15 2:50 PM
Adversary case 21-03666 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Daniel H. Golden against LOGIX Communications, LP. Fee Amount $350 (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A