Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Charles R Simpson, III
Referred: Colin H Lindsay
Case #: 3:21-cv-00469
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2021
Terminated:Apr 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 12, 2022 4:22 AM EST
Defendant
Landmark of Iroquois Park Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, LLC
Represented By
Julie C. Foster
Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, PA
contact info
Donald L. Miller, II
Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathryn Barker Smith
Represented By
David T. Royse
Ransdell Roach & Royse, PLLC
contact info
W. Keith Ransdell
Ransdell Roach & Royse, PLLC
contact info

GPO Mar 20 2024
Jury Instructions. (HMC)
GPO Mar 28 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 3/27/2025. The Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED to remove the document filed as DN 139-2 and replace it with the unredacted versions of Plaintiff's billing records. Plaintiff Smith's Bill of Costs (DN138) is APPROVED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to tax costs against Defendants in the amount $10,400.70. Plaintiff Smith's Motion for Attorney Fees (DN139) is GRANTED. Defendants' Bill of Costs (DN143) is DENIED; Defendants' Motion for Approval (DN162) is DENIED. Defendants' Motion for a Judgment or New Trial (DN 163) is DENIED. Plaintiff Smith's Motion to Strike (DN165) is DENIED. This is a final and appealable order. cc: Counsel (JM)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
202 202 appeal USCA Order Thu 04/24 3:25 PM
ORDER of USCA: Upon quality control review, No. 25-5323 is administratively closed as improvidently opened. Further, the clerk shall FILE the second amended notice of appeal on No. 24-5515 and all filings shall hereafter be made in No. 24-5515 No mandate to issue. (JM)
Related: [-]