South Carolina District Court
Judge:Kevin Mcdonald
Case #: 6:21-cv-02208
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2021
Terminated:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 16, 2022 4:37 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Jason Houser
Represented By
Rita Bolt Barker
Wyche PA
contact info
Wallace K Lightsey
Wyche PA
contact info
Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Wyche PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
John J Houser
Represented By
Rita Bolt Barker
Wyche PA
contact info
Wallace K Lightsey
Wyche PA
contact info
Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Wyche PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Ockers Company, The
Represented By
Rita Bolt Barker
Wyche PA
contact info
Wallace K Lightsey
Wyche PA
contact info
Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Wyche PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Touchview Interactive Inc
Represented By
Rita Bolt Barker
Wyche PA
contact info
Wallace K Lightsey
Wyche PA
contact info
Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Wyche PA
contact info
Counter Defendant
Clear Touch Interactive Inc
Represented By
John Raymond Perkins, Jr
Perkins Law Firm
contact info
Joseph Owen Smith
Smith Hudson Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jason Houser
Represented By
Rita Bolt Barker
Wyche PA
contact info
Wallace K Lightsey
Wyche PA
contact info
Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Wyche PA
contact info
Defendant
John J Houser
Represented By
Rita Bolt Barker
Wyche PA
contact info
Wallace K Lightsey
Wyche PA
contact info
Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Wyche PA
contact info
Defendant
Ockers Company, The
Represented By
Rita Bolt Barker
Wyche PA
contact info
Wallace K Lightsey
Wyche PA
contact info
Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Wyche PA
contact info
Defendant
Touchview Interactive Inc
Represented By
Rita Bolt Barker
Wyche PA
contact info
Wallace K Lightsey
Wyche PA
contact info
Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Wyche PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Clear Touch Interactive Inc
Represented By
John Raymond Perkins, Jr
Perkins Law Firm
contact info
Joseph Owen Smith
Smith Hudson Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
281 281 1 pgs appeal Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA Fri 04/11 1:37 PM
Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re280 AMENDED Notice of Appeal. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (kmca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
283 283 2 pgs appeal USCA Order Tue 04/15 4:29 PM
ORDER of USCA as to278 ,280 Notice of Appeal. (agig)
Related: [-]
280 280 2 pgs appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 04/10 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to275 Order on Motion for New Trial,,, 235 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,248 Judgment by Clear Touch Interactive Inc. - Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ASCDC-12382779. The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Smith, Joseph)
Related: [-]
279 279 appeal Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA Thu 04/10 12:20 PM
Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re278 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (agig)
Related: [-]
278 278 2 pgs appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 04/10 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to275 Order on Motion for New Trial,,, by Clear Touch Interactive Inc. - Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ASCDC-12380513. The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Smith, Joseph)
Related: [-]