New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Joseph N Laplante
Referred: Andrea K Johnstone
Case #: 1:21-cv-00610
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2021
Terminated:Sep 14, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jan 17, 2022 4:27 AM EST
Defendant
Governor, NH, State of
Plaintiff
Troy E. Brooks
90 Cabana Dr
Peterborough, NH 03458

GPO Aug 30 2021
///REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, 7 Motion/Pretrial Motion Question of Law, and 8 Motion for for Interlocutory Transfer Without Ruling to SCOTUS, recommending that the district judge deny the motions for a TRO (doc. no. 5), ruling on a question of law (doc. no. 7), and to transfer the case to the USSC (doc. no. 8); dismiss the case in its entirely for failure to state a claim; and direct the clerk's office to enter judgment and close the case. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 9/13/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
GPO Sep 14 2021
///ORDER approving 12 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, January 20, 2022
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/20 3:02 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 23 MOTION/Objection to Motion for Finding of Fact Motion for Change of Venue. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 10/06 2:41 PM
MOTION/Objection to Motion for Finding of Fact Motion for Change of Venue filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 17-21 - 3/30/21 Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 22 - Concord Monitor Article
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
22 22 order Judgment Wed 09/15 11:05 AM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with 21 Report and Recommendation and 12 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (jb)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Report and Recommendation Tue 09/14 4:54 PM
///ORDER approving 12 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
20 20 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/13 2:11 PM
ORDER granting 15 Motion to Addend Complaint; denying 14 Motion for Criminal Investigation Petty Theft, Obstruction of Justice, Witness Tampering, Perjury - w/unequivocal documentary proof; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Record Correction; denying 17 Motion to Recuse - Judge Who Covered Up Crucial "Facts" in Case Criminal Intentionally or Incompetently and or both Malfeasance - illegal; denying 18 Motion for Finding of Fact Judicial Misconduct. Mr. Brooks's Complaint Upon consideration does not alter the recommendation of dismissal contained in the August 30 R&R. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
Related: [-]
19 19 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendation Mon 09/13 11:03 AM
OBJECTION to12 Report and Recommendation filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 17 - 3/30/21 Letter from NH Law Library,
Att: 2 Exhibit 18 - Petition of Troy E. Brooks,
Att: 3 Exhibit 19 - Sandra L. Scheiner Examiner of Questioned Documents,
Att: 4 Exhibit 20 - Affidavit,
Att: 5 Exhibit 21 - Period of Limitations
Friday, September 10, 2021
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/10 2:55 PM
MOTION for Finding of Fact Judicial Misconduct filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Case Summary HCSC 216-1993-DM-05059
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/10 2:45 PM
MOTION to Recuse - Judge Who Covered Up Crucial "Facts" in Case Criminal Intentionally or Incompetently and or both Malfeasance - illegal filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 16 - Hillsborough County SC & Jaffrey DC document
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/10 2:36 PM
MOTION for Record Correction filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 and 2 - miscellaneous filings
Thursday, September 02, 2021
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/10 2:06 PM
MOTION for Criminal Investigation Petty Theft, Obstruction of Justice, Witness Tampering, Perjury - w/unequivocal documentary proof filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 11 - Erica Bodwell v. Mark Bodwell Master recommendation,
Att: 2 Exhibit 12 - "B v. G. 1-21-cv-00610",
Att: 3 Exhibit 13 - Stipulations,
Att: 4 Exhibit 14 - "petty theft from taxpayers"
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
15 15 misc Addendum Fri 09/10 2:23 PM
Addendum/ to1 Complaint by Troy E. Brooks. Certain exhibit(s) maintained conventionally in Clerks Office. (Attorney filers must submit conventional materials to the court within 72 hours.) (jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Evidence 1 - maintained conventionally,
Att: 2 Exhibit Evidence 10 - maintained conventionally,
Att: 3 Envelope and cover letter
Monday, August 30, 2021
13 13 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Sealed Motion Order on Motion for Hearing Mon 08/30 1:26 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Motion to Waive Fees; 4 Motion to Seal Medical Records of All Bodwells (mine stay open); 6 Motion for Federal Court N.H. file complete in Troy E. Brooks v. N.H. Supreme Court ex al; 10 Pretrial Motion for Hearing on Crime Victimization. Mr. Brooks may file as outlined if this action is not dismissed when the District Judge rules on the R&R issued this date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Report and Recommendation Mon 08/30 1:26 PM
///REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, 7 Motion/Pretrial Motion Question of Law, and 8 Motion for for Interlocutory Transfer Without Ruling to SCOTUS, recommending that the district judge deny the motions for a TRO (doc. no. 5 ), ruling on a question of law (doc. no. 7 ), and to transfer the case to the USSC (doc. no. 8 ); dismiss the case in its entirely for failure to state a claim; and direct the clerk's office to enter judgment and close the case. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 9/13/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
11 11 misc Letter Wed 08/25 11:37 AM
Letter to Troy Brooks from Clerk of Court re: Copy of docket sheet (jb)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Hearing Wed 08/25 11:24 AM
Pretrial MOTION for Hearing on Crime Victimization filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit The Impact of Crime Victimization on Quality of Life
Friday, August 20, 2021
9 9 misc Addendum Fri 08/20 2:47 PM
Addendum/ to1 Complaint by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Unopened letters,
Att: 2 Envelope
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 08/17 11:01 AM
MOTION for Interlocutory Transfer Without Ruling to SCOTUS filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 08/17 10:59 AM
MOTION/Pretrial Motion Question of Law filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Elliott Hospital Laboratory
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 08/11 4:18 PM
MOTION for Federal Court N.H. file complete in Troy E. Brooks v. N.H. Supreme Court ex al filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
5 5 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 08/11 12:39 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
4 4 motion Sealed Motion - Court Use Mon 08/09 4:30 PM
MOTION Seal Medical Records of All Bodwells (mine stay open) filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Laboratory Record
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 08/09 4:20 PM
MOTION to Waive Fees filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
2 2 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs Wed 07/21 4:01 PM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Troy E. Brooks. (ed)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/21 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Governor, NH, State of with Jury Demand filed by Troy E. Brooks. (ed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Obstruction Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
utility Case Assigned Wed 07/21 4:04 PM
Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-610-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - ECF Wed 07/21 4:05 PM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (ed)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs Wed 07/21 4:40 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting: 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Assuming the stated income is intended to reflect annual and not monthly income, or the plaintiff has misplaced commas and periods in the stated income amounts, the plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (ed)
Related: [-]