Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Referred: Lisette M Reid
Case #: 0:21-cv-61492
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2021
Terminated:May 19, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 17, 2022 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
DENISSE BETANCOURT
an individual 1460 SW 3rd Street B-8
Pompano Beach, FL 33069
Defendant
ICS GROUP, LLC
a Florida Limited Liability company 1460 SW 3rd Street B-8
Pompano Beach, FL 33069
Plaintiff
MATILDA ALUSHANI
Represented By
Robert Scott Norell
Robert S. Norell P.A.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
DANTE A. ALVAREZ
Terminated: 09/27/2021
Defendant
ROBERT ROBINSON
Terminated: 09/27/2021

GPO Sep 23 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 21 attorney Robert S. Norell's Supplemental Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Reasonable Expenses of Litigation be granted in part and denied in part. Objections to R&R due by 10/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 9/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
GPO Oct 11 2022
ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING REPORT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re DE 25 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED and incorporated by reference into this Court's Order. Plaintiff's Counsel's Supplemental Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Reasonable Expenses of Litigation DE 21 is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff's counsel is awarded $4,218.75 in attorney's fees and $460 in costs. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
31 31 respoth Answer to Writ of Garnishment Tue 04/09 2:37 PM
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by TD Bank, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 4/29/2024. (Glickman, Barry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
30 30 order Writ of Garnishment Issued (or Clks Ntc of Non-Issuance) Tue 04/02 4:18 PM
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee TD BANK in the amount of $10,551.25 re:27 Motion for Writ filed by Matilda Alushani. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
29 29 order Order on Motion for Writ Mon 04/01 4:11 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting27 Motion for Writ of Garnishment on TD BANK, N.A. in the amount of $10,551.25 plus post-judgment interest. Directing Clerk to Issue Writ . Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/1/2024. (ari)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order Referring Motion Fri 10/06 4:52 PM
ORDER REFERRING27 Plaintiff's MOTION/PETITION for Writ of Garnishment on TD BANK, N.A. filed by MATILDA ALUSHANI. Motions referred to Judge Lisette M. Reid. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/6/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Writ (of Garnishment/Execution/Other) Fri 10/06 2:42 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION/PETITION for Writ of Garnishment on TD BANK, N.A. by MATILDA ALUSHANI.(Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Defendant,
Att: 2 Writ of Garnishment TD Bank
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
26 26 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 10/11 10:26 AM
ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING REPORT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re DE25 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED and incorporated by reference into this Court's Order. Plaintiff's Counsel's Supplemental Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Reasonable Expenses of Litigation DE21 is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff's counsel is awarded $4,218.75 in attorney's fees and $460 in costs. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
25 25 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 09/23 1:04 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that21 attorney Robert S. Norell's Supplemental Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Reasonable Expenses of Litigation be granted in part and denied in part. Objections to R&R due by 10/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 9/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/05 3:47 PM
NOTICE by MATILDA ALUSHANI re 22 Order to Show Cause,,,,, Previously Awarded Fees and Costs (Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
23 23 service Certificate of Service Wed 06/29 5:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MATILDA ALUSHANI re 22 Order to Show Cause,,,,, (Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
order Order to Show Cause Mon 06/27 10:42 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OF PREVIOUSLY AWARDED FEES AND COSTS. This cause is before this Court upon21 Plaintiff's Counsel's Supplemental Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Reasonable Expenses of Litigation (the "Motion"). The Motion was referred to the undersigned for appropriate resolution. ECF Nos.19 at 6. A response to the Motion was due on June 23, 2022. To date, Defendant has failed to respond. Accordingly, having reviewed the Motion, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that within seven (7) days from the date of this Order: 1. Defendant must show cause why the Motion should not be granted. Failure to timely comply with this Order may lead to recommending that the Motion be granted by default; and 2. Counsel for Plaintiff must file a Notice of Previously Awarded Fees and Costs (the "Notice"). The Notice shall include the following: (i) the case name and number of all federal cases decided in the Southern District of Florida within the past two years in which Plaintiff's counsel was awarded attorney's fees and costs; (ii) the date of the award(s); and (iii) the hourly rate(s) awarded to the individuals identified in the Motion. Within 2 business days of this Order, Plaintiff must serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file a Notice of proof regarding the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 6/27/2022. (sd01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
21 21 motion Attorney Fees Thu 06/09 4:27 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees Supplemental by MATILDA ALUSHANI. Responses due by 6/23/2022(Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 20, 2022
20 20 order Judgment - Default Fri 05/20 1:12 PM
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of MATILDA ALUSHANI against ICS GROUP, LLC, DENISSE BETANCOURT. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
19 19 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 05/20 10:07 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT re14 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment on her FLSA claim is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment on her FMWA claim and her breach of contract claim is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment on her request for attorneys fees and costs is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a motion for attorney's fees and costs by June 9, 2022. The Court will enter a separate judgment. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 05/20 10:10 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Per DE19 Order. Closing Case. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/04 6:31 PM
NOTICE by MATILDA ALUSHANI re 15 Order Notice of Filing (Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Agreement
17 17 notice Notice of Striking Mon 04/04 6:27 PM
NOTICE of Striking by MATILDA ALUSHANI (Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/04 6:19 PM
NOTICE by MATILDA ALUSHANI re 15 Order Notice of Filing (Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 03/31 5:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file a signed copy of her written employment contract in support of her Motion for Entry of Default Final Default Judgment by April 5, 2022 . Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/31/2022. (cbn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
14 14 motion Default Judgment Tue 01/18 2:38 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment by MATILDA ALUSHANI.(Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Damages,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Detailed time and costs,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 01/12 11:28 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. A Clerk's Default was entered against the Defendants on September 24, 2021. However, no motion for entry of final default judgment has been filed. Accordingly, by January 20, 2022 , Plaintiff shall either file a motion for final default judgment against the remaining Defendants or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure to timely respond to this order shall result in dismissal of this action . Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/12/2022. (cbn)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/28 1:48 PM
ORDER. Motion to Drop Party Defendants Dante Alvarez and Robert Robinson DE#10 is GRANTED. Defendants Dante Alvarez and Robert Robinson are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default - FORM Fri 09/24 2:56 PM
ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re9 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to ICS GROUP, LLC, DENISSE BETANCOURT. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 9/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/24 11:34 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Drop Party by MATILDA ALUSHANI.(Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 motion Clerks Entry of Default Fri 09/24 10:24 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to DENISSE BETANCOURT, ICS GROUP, LLC by MATILDA ALUSHANI. (Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
8 8 misc Statement Wed 09/08 6:30 PM
Statement of: Claim by MATILDA ALUSHANI re6 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
7 7 7 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 08/25 12:41 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/24/2021 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 08/25 12:38 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT CASES AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND FAIRNESS HEARING Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Settlement Conference and Fairness Hearing. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 08/24 1:51 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MATILDA ALUSHANI. DENISSE BETANCOURT served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 08/24 1:50 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MATILDA ALUSHANI. ICS GROUP, LLC served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 07/22 9:43 AM
Summons Issued as to DANTE A. ALVAREZ, DENISSE BETANCOURT, ICS GROUP, LLC, ROBERT ROBINSON.(ebz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/21 5:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14864852, filed by MATILDA ALUSHANI.(Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s),
Att: 4 Summon(s),
Att: 5 Summon(s)
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 07/22 9:17 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
Related: [-]