Odette Blanco De Fernandez nee Blanco Rosell et al v. Seaboard Corporation
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Colm F Connolly |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-01052 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 17, 2022 4:53 AM EST |
Defendant
Seaboard Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Magdalena Blanco Montoto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sergio Blanco de la Torre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guillermo Blanco de la Torre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Florentino Blanco de la Torre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eduardo Blanco de la Torre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Blanco de la Torre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Odette Blanco de Fernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emma Ruth Blanco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hebe Blanco Miyares
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacqueline M. Delgado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph E. Bushman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lydia Blanco Bonafonte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Byron Blanco, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susannah Valentina Blanco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Liana Maria Blanco
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
4
pgs
order
Order Staying Case
Wed 09/28 4:06 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/28/2022. (kmd) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
Wed 09/28 10:54 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying Case by Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Sergio Blanco de la Torre. (Vild, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/14 12:19 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jared R. Butcher - filed by Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Sergio Blanco de la Torre. (Vild, Michael) |
|
order
SO ORDERED
Wed 09/14 12:44 PM
SO ORDERED, re33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jared R. Butcher, filed by Joseph E. Bushman, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Byron Blanco, Jr., Liana Maria Blanco, Sergio Blanco de la Torre, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Emma Ruth Blanco, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Carlos Blanco de la Torre. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/14/2022. (kmd) |
||
Thursday, September 01, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Status Report
Thu 09/01 5:47 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Sergio Blanco de la Torre.(Vild, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
31 | 31
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Case Stayed
Mon 08/08 2:21 PM
ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted (D.I.15 ) is STAYED until 30 days after resolution of Robert Glen v. Trip Advisor LLC, eta/., Case Nos. 21-1842 & 21-1843 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than 14 days after the Third Circuit issues its decisions in those cases, the parties shall file a joint status report in which they state, among other things, whether supplemental briefing with respect to the Third Circuit's decisions in the Glen appeals would assist the Court in resolving the pending motion to dismiss. Discovery will proceed during the stay of adjudication of the motion. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/8/2022. (nmf) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Letter
Fri 08/05 11:30 AM
Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Michael L. Vild, Esq. regarding Opposition of Stay of Defendant's Pending Motion to Dismiss - re Oral Order,,, Set Deadlines,,. (Vild, Michael) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Letter
Fri 08/05 11:03 AM
Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Jody C. Barillare regarding agreement with the stay as proposed by the Court - re Oral Order,,, Set Deadlines,,. (Barillare, Jody) |
|
utility
- CORRECTING ENTRY
Fri 08/05 11:44 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The order has been deleted as it was filed in this case in error. (nmf) |
||
Monday, August 01, 2022 | ||
order
Oral Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 08/01 12:34 PM
ORAL ORDER: The Court is inclined to stay resolution of the pending motion to dismiss (D.I.15 ) until the Third Circuit decides Robert Glen v. Trip Advisor LLC, et al., Case Nos. 21-1842 & 21-1843 Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that both sides shall inform the Court by letters filed no later than noon on August 5, 2022 whether they oppose such a stay. If a side opposes a stay, it shall argue in the letter, using no more than 1,000 words, why a stay would be inappropriate. Setting Deadlines: Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/5/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/1/2022. (kmd) |
||
Thursday, June 23, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 06/23 10:57 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 MOTION to Seal Document:25 Statement,, filed by Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Sergio Blanco de la Torre. (Vild, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 16, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 06/16 11:38 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 MOTION to Seal Document:25 Statement,, filed by Seaboard Corporation. (Barillare, Jody) |
|
Thursday, June 02, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Seal Document
Thu 06/02 12:27 PM
MOTION to Seal Document:25 Statement,, - filed by Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Sergio Blanco de la Torre.(Vild, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Local Rule 7.1.1 Certification, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
misc
Statement
Thu 06/02 12:22 PM
[SEALED] STATEMENT //Plaintiffs' Third-Party Litigation Funding Statement by Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Sergio Blanco de la Torre.(Vild, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
discov
Notice of Service
Wed 05/11 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Seaboard Corporation's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Seaboard Corporation.(Barillare, Jody) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 04/21 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Seaboard Corporation re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted (Barillare, Jody) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, March 11, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
discov
Notice of Service
Fri 03/11 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Seaboard Corp. filed by Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Sergio Blanco de la Torre.(Vild, Michael) |
|
Friday, December 17, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Brief - Reply
Fri 12/17 4:33 PM
REPLY BRIEF re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by Seaboard Corporation. (Barillare, Jody) |
|
Monday, November 29, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition
Mon 11/29 2:38 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Sergio Blanco de la Torre.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/6/2021.(Vild, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply
Thu 11/18 12:11 PM
SO ORDERED, re18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiffs' Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Defendant's Deadline to File Reply Brief in Support to Answering Brief: 11/29/2021; Reply Brief 12/17/2021, filed by Joseph E. Bushman, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Byron Blanco, Jr., Liana Maria Blanco, Sergio Blanco de la Torre, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Emma Ruth Blanco, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Carlos Blanco de la Torre. Set Briefing Schedule: re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted. Answering Brief due 11/29/2021. Reply Brief due 12/17/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/18/2021. (kmd) |
|
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
Wed 11/17 3:01 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiffs' Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Defendant's Deadline to File Reply Brief in Support to Answering Brief: 11/29/2021; Reply Brief 12/17/2021 - filed by Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Sergio Blanco de la Torre. (Vild, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, November 10, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
Wed 11/10 11:19 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Seaboard Corporation. (Barillare, Jody) |
|
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
Thu 11/04 4:41 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted with Certificate of Compliance filed by Seaboard Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/18/2021.(Barillare, Jody) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Subject Jurisdiction
Thu 11/04 4:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted - filed by Seaboard Corporation.(Barillare, Jody) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 21, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Complaint - Amended
Thu 10/21 2:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Seaboard Corporation- filed by Sergio Blanco de la Torre, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Liana Maria Blanco, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Byron Blanco, Jr., Emma Ruth Blanco, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Joseph E. Bushman, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Florentino Blanco de la Torre.(Vild, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Tue 10/12 9:03 AM
SO ORDERED, re13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian A. Herman, Robert M. Brochin, Carl A. Valenstein, and Matthew Papkin filed by Seaboard Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/12/2021. (kmd) |
||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Tue 10/12 11:57 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Carl A. Valenstein, Matthew Papkin, Brian A. Herman, and Robert M. Brochin for Seaboard Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) |
||
Monday, October 11, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/11 4:46 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian A. Herman, Robert M. Brochin, Carl A. Valenstein, and Matthew Papkin - filed by Seaboard Corporation.(Barillare, Jody) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Brian A. Herman, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Robert M. Brochin, | ||
Att: 3 Certification of Carl A. Valenstein, | ||
Att: 4 Certification of Matthew Papkin | ||
Thursday, September 30, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
Thu 09/30 3:58 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and failure to state a claim filed by Seaboard Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2021.(Barillare, Jody) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Subject Jurisdiction
Thu 09/30 3:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and failure to state a claim - filed by Seaboard Corporation.(Barillare, Jody) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Wed 09/08 9:01 AM
SO ORDERED, re10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to September 30, 2021 filed by Seaboard Corporation. Reset Answer Deadlines: Seaboard Corporation answer due 9/30/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/8/2021. (kmd) |
||
Tuesday, September 07, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
Tue 09/07 10:54 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to September 30, 2021 - filed by Seaboard Corporation. (Barillare, Jody) |
|
Thursday, September 02, 2021 | ||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Thu 09/02 8:11 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Martin F. Cunniff for Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Sergio Blanco de la Torre added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk) |
||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Thu 09/02 1:18 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Richard W. Fields for Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, and Sergio Blanco de la Torre added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) |
||
Tuesday, August 17, 2021 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Tue 08/17 12:28 PM
SO ORDERED, re9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard W. Fields, Martin F. Cunniff and Edward Han filed by Joseph E. Bushman, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Byron Blanco, Jr., Liana Maria Blanco, Sergio Blanco de la Torre, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Emma Ruth Blanco, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Carlos Blanco de la Torre. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/17/2021. (fms) |
||
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/16 12:25 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard W. Fields, Martin F. Cunniff and Edward Han - filed by Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Sergio Blanco de la Torre. (Vild, Michael) |
|
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Mon 08/16 3:11 PM
SO ORDERED, re8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to September 13, 2021 filed by Seaboard Corporation. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Seaboard Corporation answer due 9/13/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/16/2021. (fms) |
||
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
Fri 08/13 10:32 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to September 13, 2021 - filed by Seaboard Corporation. (Barillare, Jody) |
|
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Thu 08/05 3:00 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Melvin White,David Baron, and Laina C. Lopez for Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, and Sergio Blanco de la Torre added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) |
||
Monday, August 02, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/02 3:26 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Baron, Esquire, Melvin White, Esquire and Laina C. Lopez, Esquire of Berliner Corcoran & Rowe LLP - filed by Emma Ruth Blanco, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Byron Blanco, Jr., Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Joseph E. Bushman, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Sergio Blanco de la Torre. (Vild, Michael) |
|
order
SO ORDERED
Mon 08/02 4:46 PM
SO ORDERED, re7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Baron, Esquire, Melvin White, Esquire and Laina C. Lopez, Esquire of Berliner Corcoran & Rowe LLP filed by Joseph E. Bushman, Florentino Blanco de la Torre, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Byron Blanco, Jr., Liana Maria Blanco, Sergio Blanco de la Torre, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Emma Ruth Blanco, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Carlos Blanco de la Torre. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/2/2021. (fms) |
||
Wednesday, July 28, 2021 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/28 11:40 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) |
||
Monday, July 26, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/26 9:17 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sergio Blanco de la Torre, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Liana Maria Blanco, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Byron Blanco, Jr., Emma Ruth Blanco, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Joseph E. Bushman, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Florentino Blanco de la Torre. (Vild, Michael) |
|
Friday, July 23, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/23 1:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sergio Blanco de la Torre, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Guillermo Blanco de la Torre, Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Liana Maria Blanco, Carlos Blanco de la Torre, Jacqueline M. Delgado, Eduardo Blanco de la Torre, Byron Blanco, Jr., Emma Ruth Blanco, Odette Blanco de Fernandez, Joseph E. Bushman, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Magdalena Blanco Montoto, Florentino Blanco de la Torre. Seaboard Corporation served on 7/23/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Vild, Michael) |
|
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Thu 07/22 11:15 AM
Letter attaching additional filing fee of $6,800, receipt number DEX035938. (apk) |
|
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/22 9:08 AM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Seaboard Corporation.(apk) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Issued | ||
2 | 2
misc
Magistrate Consent Forms
Thu 07/22 8:48 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) |
|
1 | 1
42
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/22 8:47 AM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Seaboard Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BDEDC-3662225.) - filed by Jacqueline M. Delgado, Byron Blanco, Jr., Carlos Blanco De La Torre, Hebe Blanco Miyares, Lydia Blanco Bonafonte, Odette Blanco De Fernandez nee Blanco Rosell, Emma Ruth Blanco, Florentino Blanco De La Torre, Joseph E. Bushman, Sergio Blanco De La Torre, Guillermo Blanco De La Torre, Liana Maria Blanco, Susannah Valentina Blanco, Eduardo Blanco De La Torre, Magdalena Blanco Montoto.(apk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |