New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00384
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2021
Last checked: Friday Jul 23, 2021 3:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Steven Allessandro (1)
Represented By
Kannan Sundaram
Federal Defenders
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patrick J Campbell
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/23/2021 4:18 AM EDT
Thursday, July 01, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Arraignment as to Steven Allessandro (1) Count Complaint held on 7/1/2021, Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Steven Allessandro held on 7/1/2021, Initial Appearance as to Steven Allessandro held on 7/1/2021. AUSA Emily Dean appeared via video. FDNY Kannan Sundaram appeared via teleconference. Dft appeared via video. Pretrial Officer Valeria Lopez appeared via teleconference. Dft arraigned on the complaint. Preliminary hearing waived. Dfse counsel & govt agree on a $50,000 bond with 2 sureties. 2 sureties appeared via teleconference, sworn a & advised of the bond obligations and gave consent to the court to sign the bond on their behalf. Dft advised of the bond conditions and gave consent to the court to sign the bond on his behalf. Dft released on $50,000 bond. Govt given Rule 5f warnings. (WebEx Log # 7/1/21 5:30-6:00.) (Chin, Felix) [1:21-mj-00776-VMS]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Steven Allessandro (1). (Chin, Felix) [1:21-mj-00776-VMS]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Steven Allessandro (1) $50,000. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/1/2021. (Chin, Felix) [1:21-mj-00776-VMS]
Related: [-]
3 3 REDACTION by Steven Allessandro to2 1 - Sealed Document CR, Order Setting Conditions of Release (Chin, Felix) [1:21-mj-00776-VMS]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Steven Allessandro (Chin, Felix) [1:21-mj-00776-VMS]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER: This order is entered pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) to confirm the prosecution's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations as to Steven Allessandro. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/1/2021. (Chin, Felix) [1:21-mj-00776-VMS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
7 7 INDICTMENT as to Steven Allessandro (1) count(s) 1, 2. (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet