Islam v. Lyft, Inc.
Original Case: 1:20-cv-03004
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01772 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 08, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 09, 2021 3:29 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Lyft, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MD Islam, on behalf of himself and those similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/09/2021 3:27 AM EST |
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant MD Islam, FILED. [3142163] 21-1772 [Entered: 07/22/2021 09:54 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/09/2021, RECEIVED.[3142183] 21-1772 [Entered: 07/22/2021 10:09 AM] | |
3 | 3 12 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/28/2021, RECEIVED.[3142184] 21-1772 [Entered: 07/22/2021 10:10 AM] |