Original Case: 2:21-cv-00574

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-16209
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2021
Terminated:Aug 09, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Aug 11, 2022 1:31 AM PDT
Amicus Curiae
WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By
John Mercer Masslon II
Washington Legal Foundation
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Mark Emery
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
CHICKASAW NATION
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
CHICKASAW NATION DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ARDMORE HEALTH CLINIC
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
CHICKASAW NATION MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
PURCELL HEALTH CLINIC
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
TISHOMINGO HEALTH CLINIC
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
CHICKASAW NATION ONLINE PHARMACY REFILL CENTER
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Petitioner - Appellee
CAREMARK, LLC
Represented By
Jon T. Neumann
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Sarah M. Harris
Williams & Connolly, LLP
contact info
Kimberly Broecker
Williams & Connolly, LLP
contact info
Peter J. Kocoras
Thompson Hine, LLP
contact info
Helen E. White
Protect Democracy
contact info
Petitioner - Appellee
AETNA, INC.
Represented By
Jon T. Neumann
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Sarah M. Harris
Williams & Connolly, LLP
contact info
Kimberly Broecker
Williams & Connolly, LLP
contact info
Peter J. Kocoras
Thompson Hine, LLP
contact info
Helen E. White
Protect Democracy
contact info
Petitioner - Appellee
CAREMARK RX, LLC
Represented By
Jon T. Neumann
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Sarah M. Harris
Williams & Connolly, LLP
contact info
Kimberly Broecker
Williams & Connolly, LLP
contact info
Peter J. Kocoras
Thompson Hine, LLP
contact info
Helen E. White
Protect Democracy
contact info
Petitioner - Appellee
CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC
Represented By
Jon T. Neumann
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Sarah M. Harris
Williams & Connolly, LLP
contact info
Kimberly Broecker
Williams & Connolly, LLP
contact info
Peter J. Kocoras
Thompson Hine, LLP
contact info
Helen E. White
Protect Democracy
contact info
Petitioner - Appellee
CAREMARK PHC, LLC
Represented By
Jon T. Neumann
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Sarah M. Harris
Williams & Connolly, LLP
contact info
Kimberly Broecker
Williams & Connolly, LLP
contact info
Peter J. Kocoras
Thompson Hine, LLP
contact info
Helen E. White
Protect Democracy
contact info
Petitioner - Appellee
AETNA HEALTH, INC.
Represented By
Jon T. Neumann
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Sarah M. Harris
Williams & Connolly, LLP
contact info
Kimberly Broecker
Williams & Connolly, LLP
contact info
Peter J. Kocoras
Thompson Hine, LLP
contact info
Helen E. White
Protect Democracy
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CAREMARK, LLC
Represented By
Jon T. Neumann
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
AETNA HEALTH, INC.
Represented By
Jon T. Neumann
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
AETNA, INC.
Represented By
Jon T. Neumann
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CAREMARK RX, LLC
Represented By
Jon T. Neumann
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC
Represented By
Jon T. Neumann
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CAREMARK PHC, LLC
Represented By
Jon T. Neumann
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
ARDMORE HEALTH CLINIC
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Matthew M. Collette
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
CHICKASAW NATION
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Matthew M. Collette
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
CHICKASAW NATION DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Matthew M. Collette
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
CHICKASAW NATION MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Matthew M. Collette
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
CHICKASAW NATION ONLINE PHARMACY REFILL CENTER
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
PURCELL HEALTH CLINIC
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
TISHOMINGO HEALTH CLINIC
Represented By
Nicholas Shodrok
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Ty D. Frankel
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC
contact info
Bradley W. Beskin
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Massey
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Patricia Sawyer
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Chad Ethan Ihrig
Nix Patterson, LLP
contact info
Reggie N. Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info

GPO Aug 09 2022
FILED OPINION (J. CLIFFORD WALLACE, DANNY J. BOGGS and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) For the foregoing reasons, we affirm the judgment of the district court compelling arbitration. We express no opinion on the enforceability of the underlying arbitration provision, whichâ??in light of the delegation clauseâ??is an issue that the arbitrator must decide in the first instance. We do not decide, for example, whether the Nation has waived its sovereign immunity with respect to any counterclaims that Caremark might assert against the Nation in arbitration, or whether the Recovery Act precludes arbitration of the merits of the Nationâ??s claims. Judge: MTF Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [12512847]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected opinion (summary edited). 08/08/2022 by SLM]

Docket last updated: 08/11/2022 1:26 AM PDT
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Ardmore Health Clinic, Chickasaw Nation, Chickasaw Nation Department of Health, Chickasaw Nation Medical Center, Chickasaw Nation Online Pharmacy Refill Center, Purcell Health Clinic and Tishomingo Health Clinic Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/28/2021. Appellants Ardmore Health Clinic, Chickasaw Nation, Chickasaw Nation Department of Health, Chickasaw Nation Medical Center, Chickasaw Nation Online Pharmacy Refill Center, Purcell Health Clinic and Tishomingo Health Clinic opening brief due 09/20/2021. Appellees Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna, Inc., Caremark PHC, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC and CaremarkPCS Health LLC answering brief due 10/20/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12178628] (JBS) [Entered: 07/21/2021 10:17 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet