Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:David S Cercone
Case #: 2:21-cv-00979
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2021
Terminated:Jul 06, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 19, 2022 3:22 AM EST
Defendant
ADAM BAKER
Defendant
R.A.M. RODNEY CORNER, INC
Plaintiff
JESSICA STRAUTMANN
Represented By
Matthew C. Cairone
Fishkin Lucks LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Friday, June 23, 2023
25 25 misc Satisfaction of Jgm - for Jgms entered after 7/1/05 Fri 06/23 2:18 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re24 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, entered In favor of JESSICA STRAUTMANN Against ADAM BAKER, In favor of JESSICA STRAUTMANN Against R.A.M. RODNEY CORNER, INC by JESSICA STRAUTMANN. (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 07/06 9:56 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Default Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff, Jessica Strautmann, and against Defendants, R.A.M. Rodney Corner, Inc. and Adam Baker, jointly and severally, in the amount of $84,558.40 for backpay/lost wages, $6,118.91 in prejudgment interest on Plaintiffs lost wages, $7,500.00 for emotional distress, and $26,392.00 in attorney fees for a total amount of $124,569.31. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/6/2022. (jmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
23 23 1 pgs minutes Motion Hearing Thu 06/30 11:57 AM
Minute Entry for hearing on motion for default judgment held before Judge David S. Cercone on 6/30/2022: Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment held. The Court orally granted the motion and gave counsel 1 week to supplement petition for attorney fees and prejudgment and post judgment interest. The Judgment Order will be entered soon after the Court receives such supplements. (Court Reporter: Amanda Williamson) (jmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit 2
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 04/19 7:28 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 4/19/2022. (kly)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/19 7:29 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/30/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. (kly)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
21 21 motion Continue Mon 04/18 12:45 PM
First MOTION to Continue Evidentiary Hearing by JESSICA STRAUTMANN. (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
20 20 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Wed 01/26 9:48 AM
ORDER - the Hearing on17 MOTION for Default Judgment scheduled for Thursday, February 10, 2022, is continued to Thursday, April 21, 2022 at 11:00 a.m., Courtroom 7A, Seventh Floor, United States Post Office and Courthouse, 700 Grant Street, Pittsburgh, PA. before Judge David S. Cercone. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 1/26/2022. (jmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 12/09 8:29 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Evidentiary Hearing re MOTION for Default Judgment against ADAM BAKER, R.A.M. RODNEY CORNER, INC by JESSICA STRAUTMANN. set for 2/10/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. (kly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
18 18 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 12/08 3:27 PM
BRIEF in Support re17 Motion for Default Judgment filed by JESSICA STRAUTMANN. (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Default Judgment Wed 12/08 3:26 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against ADAM BAKER, R.A.M. RODNEY CORNER, INC by JESSICA STRAUTMANN. (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 29, 2021
16 16 order Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 10/29 3:51 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ADAM BAKER (jd)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 10/29 3:51 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ADAM BAKER (jd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 28, 2021
14 14 misc Request for Default Thu 10/28 5:02 PM
REQUEST by JESSICA STRAUTMANN for entry of DEFAULT against R.A.M. RODNEY CORNER, INC . (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
13 13 misc Request for Default Thu 10/28 5:00 PM
REQUEST by JESSICA STRAUTMANN for entry of DEFAULT against ADAM BAKER . (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Friday, October 01, 2021
12 12 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Fri 10/01 5:31 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JESSICA STRAUTMANN. R.A.M. RODNEY CORNER, INC served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 09/17 11:07 AM
Summons Issued as to R.A.M. RODNEY CORNER, INC (jd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
10 10 service Praecipe to Reissue Summons Thu 09/16 2:48 PM
PRAECIPE to Reissue Summons by JESSICA STRAUTMANN (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to R.A.M. Rodney Corner, Inc.
9 9 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Thu 09/16 2:43 PM
NOTICE to Court by JESSICA STRAUTMANN re7 Summons/Returned Returned Executed (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
8 8 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Tue 09/14 11:04 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JESSICA STRAUTMANN. ADAM BAKER served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Tue 09/14 11:02 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JESSICA STRAUTMANN. R.A.M. RODNEY CORNER, INC served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 09/07 9:07 AM
Summons Issued as to ADAM BAKER, R.A.M. RODNEY CORNER, INC (Main Document: Summons to ADAM BAKER; Attachments: #1 Summons to R.A.M. RODNEY CORNER, INC.) (cww)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
5 5 misc Errata Fri 09/03 2:05 PM
Errata re Quality Control message - Generic Correction,4 Praecipe to Issue Summons by JESSICA STRAUTMANN. Reason for Correction: No Praecipe attached. (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to Adam Baker,
Att: 2 Summons to Adam Baker as registered agent for R.A.M. Rodney Corner, Inc.
Thursday, September 02, 2021
4 4 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Thu 09/02 11:38 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JESSICA STRAUTMANN (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
misc QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply) Thu 09/02 3:35 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re4 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: no Praecipe attached, only summons. CORRECTION: Filer advised to refile using the Errata Event, linking to this entry, a document titled Praecipe to Issue Summons, and attaching completed summons. ACTION REQUIRED (jd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
3 3 service Certificate of Service Wed 07/28 12:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JESSICA STRAUTMANN (Cairone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
2 2 adr Notice of ADR Designation Tue 07/27 11:20 AM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Fri 07/23 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT against ADAM BAKER, R.A.M. RODNEY CORNER, INC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6623437), filed by JESSICA STRAUTMANN. (jv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet