Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 6:21-cv-00757
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2021
Terminated:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 19, 2022 2:32 AM CST
Defendant
Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Elise Edlin
Perkins Coie Llp - San Francisco
contact info
Sarah E. Piepmeier
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paltalk Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Bryce T. Barcelo
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Kalpana Srinivasan
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Max L. Tribble, Jr.
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Ryan V. Caughey
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Cisco WebEx LLC
Terminated: 10/14/2021
Represented By
Elise Edlin
Perkins Coie Llp - San Francisco
contact info
Sarah E. Piepmeier
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
WebEx Communications, Inc.
Terminated: 10/14/2021
Represented By
Elise Edlin
Perkins Coie Llp - San Francisco
contact info
Sarah E. Piepmeier
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
244 244 misc Response Fri 04/25 9:17 AM
RESPONSE TO241 PALTALKS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ON DATE OF FIRST INFRINGEMENT by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (lad)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 04/24 4:01 PM
Text Order GRANTING243 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court hereby ORDERS that the Motion is GRANTED and directs the Clerk's Office to file Cisco's Response, which is attached to the present Motion as Exhibit A, on the docket. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pwlc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
243 243 motion Leave to File Document Wed 04/23 8:04 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief on Date of First Infringement [Dkt. 241] by Cisco Systems, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex A - Response,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 04/23 7:54 AM
Text Order GRANTING242 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright. After consideration of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief and Defendant's Preliminary Response, the Court hereby GRANTS Defendant leave to file a supplemental response, not to exceed 10 pages in length, to Plaintiff's brief on or before April 28, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pwlc)
Related: [-]