Puerto Rico District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-00228
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jul 24, 2021 3:38 AM AST
Defendant
Yadiel Manuel Ramos-Santiago (1)
Represented By
Rafael Anglada-Lopez
Rafael Anglada Lopez Law Office
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation Officer
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jeanette M. Collazo-Ortiz
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/24/2021 4:11 AM AST
Thursday, June 24, 2021
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Yadiel Manuel Ramos-Santiago (1) count(s) 1, 2. (idg) (idg).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/25/2021) NPV
2 2 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document will be re-filed*** Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez:Return of Indictment by Grand Jury as to Yadiel Manuel Ramos-Santiago (1) held on 6/24/2021. Arraignment/Detention set for 7/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in VTC Bridge MEL before US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez. Arrest Warrant to be issued.(Court Reporter DCR.) (idg) Modified on 7/9/2021 as per cd's request(ab).
Related: [-]
3 3 *RESTRICTED* Arrest Warrant Issued by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez in case as to Yadiel Manuel Ramos-Santiago (1). (idg)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez: Return of Indictment by Grand Jury as to Yadiel Manuel Ramos-Santiago (1) held on 6/24/2021. Arrest Warrant to be issued. (Court Reporter dcr.) (ab)
Related: [-]