Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:21-mj-00444
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2021
Terminated:Jul 14, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jul 25, 2021 2:22 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mark L Nichols-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Nancy E Larson-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Russo LaDonta Williams (1)
Terminated: 07/14/2021
Represented By
George Howard Lancaster-FPD, Jr
Federal Public Defender Ndtx
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/12/2021 4:05 AM CDT
Friday, June 25, 2021
1 1 2 pgs COMPLAINT as to Russo LaDonta Williams (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (jah)
Related: [-]
2 2 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Russo LaDonta Williams held on 6/25/2021. Date of Arrest: 6/25/2021; Deft executed financial affidavit; o/appointing FPD entered; Preliminary & Detention Hearing set 6/29/21 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; o/temp detention entered; deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Alex Lewis for Nancy Larson; Defense - George Lancaster. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Honstein.) (jah) Modified on 6/25/2021 (jah).
Related: [-]
3 3 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Russo LaDonta Williams (jah)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Russo LaDonta Williams. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 6/25/2021) (jah)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Russo LaDonta Williams (jah)
Related: [-]
6 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Russo LaDonta Williams. Detention & Preliminary Hearing set for 6/29/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 6/25/2021) (jah)
Related: [-]