Arizona District Court
Judge:G Murray Snow
Case #: 3:21-cv-08166
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2021
Terminated:Mar 27, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 23, 2022 3:13 AM MST
Defendant
Checkride Prep LLC
Represented By
Robert Scott Pearson
Burris & Macomber PLLC
contact info
D Rob Burris
Burris & Macomber PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Prep Group LLC
Represented By
Robert Scott Pearson
Burris & Macomber PLLC
contact info
D Rob Burris
Burris & Macomber PLLC
contact info
Defendant
David Tushin
Represented By
Robert Scott Pearson
Burris & Macomber PLLC
contact info
D Rob Burris
Burris & Macomber PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Global Aviation Institute LLC
Represented By
Robert Scott Pearson
Burris & Macomber PLLC
contact info
D Rob Burris
Burris & Macomber PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pilot Institute LLC
Represented By
Laura Allison Rogal
Jaburg & Wilk Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Michael Benjamin Dvoren
Jaburg & Wilk Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
102 102 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/12 11:44 AM
ORDER - The Court has received Defendant David Tushin's Notice of Change of Address101 . The Notice provides Defendant's change of address in a foreign language. If Defendant wants his mailing address changed, he must file a new Notice of Change of Address and provide his address in English. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/12/2023. (KFZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
101 101 notice Notice of Change of Address (Party) Tue 04/11 12:58 PM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David Tushin: Address was not modified. The new address information was provided in another language (the envelope was from China). The party receives electronic notification of filings. (WLP)
Related: [-]