Minnesota District Court
Judge:Paul A Magnuson
Referred: Douglas L Micko
Case #: 0:21-cv-01721
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jan 24, 2022 4:02 AM CST
Defendant
Woodstock Capital, LLC
Represented By
Mathew Mark Meyer
Meyer Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Clark Reiner
Represented By
Mathew Mark Meyer
Meyer Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Hmong College Prep Academy
Represented By
John Thomas Duffey
Maslon LLP
contact info
Clayton Carlson
Maslon LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 07 2021
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer 5 is DENIED; and 2. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 7 is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 10/7/2021. (LLM)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, December 16, 2024
84 84 order Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail Mon 12/16 11:07 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER in Response to83 Letter to Magistrate Judge. The Court thanks the parties for their joint update and grants their request for additional time for payment to be made in accordance with the settlement agreement. Absent dismissal, the Court directs the parties to provide another status update via CM/ECF no later than January 6, 2025. The parties are advised that based on the forthcoming update, the Court may set a status conference to occur shortly thereafter, to be attended by attorneys of record as well as parties to this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 12/16/2024. (jme)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
83 83 misc Letter to Magistrate Judge Fri 12/13 7:57 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Woodstock Capital, LLC Joint Update Correspondence to Court . (Meyer, Mathew)
Related: [-]