Hawaii District Court
Judge:Derrick K Watson
Referred: Kenneth J Mansfield
Case #: 1:21-mc-00301
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2021
Terminated:Sep 23, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM HST
Monday, September 30, 2024
5 5 misc Mail Returned Mon 09/30 2:25 PM
Mail returned as Undeliverable re4 Order of Suspension ; Returned to Sender; Unable to Forward. (apg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order of Suspension Mon 09/23 1:47 PM
ORDER OF SUSPENSION as to Paul Herran, signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON, U.S. District Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi, U.S. District Judge Jill A. Otake and U.S. District Judge Micah W. J. Smith on 09/23/2024. (apg)
Related: [-]
misc Court's Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 1:58 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of4 Order of Suspension has been served by First Class Mail Certified Mail 70162710000087794025to the addresses of record to Paul Herran. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (apg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
3 3 misc Mail Returned Thu 09/19 12:46 PM
Mail returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause. (hkm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
misc Court's Certificate of Service Tue 09/10 2:29 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of1 Order to Show Cause has been served (2nd ATTEMPT) by First Class Mail Certified Mail Receipt #70162710000087794018 to the addresses of record to: Herran Law Firm c/o Paul Herran- Nauru Tower 1050 Queen Street, STE 100 Honolulu, HI 96815. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (apg) (apg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
2 2 misc Mail Returned Fri 08/06 9:50 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable Related [+]. Mail sent to Paul Herran at Herran Law Firm, The HUB, 1050 Queen Street, Suite 100, Honolulu, HI 96814 returned undelivered, not deliverable as addressed. (emt, )
Related: [-] ECF No.1 Order to Show Cause
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
misc Court's Certificate of Service Wed 07/28 9:04 AM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of1 Order to Show Cause has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record via certified mail RRR#70173040000003934881 to: Herran Law Firm, The HUB, 1050 Queen Street, suite 100, Honolulu, HI 96814. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (apg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
1 1 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 07/28 8:52 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 07/27/2021.(apg, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Hawaii State Supreme Court Order