New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Referred: Ona T Wang
Case #: 1:21-cv-06439
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jan 24, 2022 4:12 AM EST
Defendant
Ricardo Berner
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Axs Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Practiko, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Axs Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rakower Law PLLC
Represented By
Melissa Yang
Rakower Law PLLC
contact info
Michael C. Rakower
Rakower Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
135 135 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 4:25 PM
ORDER: The above-captioned case was transferred to the undersigned on April 28, 2025. The parties are hereby directed to promptly meet and confer and to file a joint status update, within 14 days after the entry of this Order, setting forth the following matters, AS FURTHER SET FORTH IN THIS ORDER. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/29/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 04/28 10:38 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Jennifer H. Rearden is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]