Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:21-mj-01314
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Jul 29, 2021 2:31 AM CDT
Defendant
Juan De Dios Lucio-Medina (1)
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 07/29/2021 2:58 AM CDT
Saturday, July 24, 2021
Arrest of Juan De Dios Lucio-Medina (clda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 7/24/2021 as to Juan De Dios Lucio-Medina. (clda)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Juan De Dios Lucio-Medina. (clda)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Juan De Dios Lucio-Medina (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Juan De Dios Lucio-Medina (1).By Judge Collis White. (clda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Collis White as to Juan De Dios Lucio-Medina. (clda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Collis White as to Juan De Dios Lucio-Medina. (clda)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Collis White:Initial Appearance as to Juan De Dios Lucio-Medina held on 7/27/2021 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 7/30/2021 2:00PM before Judge Collis White, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Juan De Dios Lucio-Medina (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - MCIENEGA.) (clda)
Related: [-]