Original Case: 7:21-cv-04543

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-01818
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2021
Terminated:Sep 15, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Sep 16, 2021 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Judge Robert J. Miller, Personally and in his official capacity as Judge of the New York State Appellate Court, Second Judicial Department
Represented By
Barbara D. Underwood
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Aprilanne Agostino, Personally and in her official capacity as Clerk of the Court
Represented By
Barbara D. Underwood
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Wendy Stynes, Personally and in her Official Capacity as Associate Deputy Clerk of the Court
Represented By
Barbara D. Underwood
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph Castellano, Personally and in his Official Capacity as Program Coordinator - Legal Division
Represented By
Barbara D. Underwood
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Jeannine Muratore, Personally and in her Official Capacity as Program Administrator - Electronic Filing
Represented By
Barbara D. Underwood
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Supreme Court of the State of New York, Westchester County
Represented By
Barbara D. Underwood
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
New York State Appellant Court, Second Judicial Department
Represented By
Barbara D. Underwood
New York State Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Brian Stryker Weinstein
Represented By
Brian S. Weinstein
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Dina Kaplan
Represented By
Dina S. Kaplan
The Kitson Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Gloria Marchetti-Bruck
Represented By
Gloria Marchetti-Bruck
Law Offices of Gloria Marchetti-Bruck
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
New York State Appellate Court, Second Judicial Department
Plaintiff - Appellant
Elizabeth Harding Weinstein
Represented By
Elizabeth Harding Weinstein
-
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/05/2021 9:03 AM EST
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Elizabeth Harding Weinstein, FILED. [3146322] 21-1818 [Entered: 07/28/2021 02:37 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 30 pgs Case FILED
2 2 14 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 07/15/2021, RECEIVED.[3146325] 21-1818 [Entered: 07/28/2021 02:44 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3146326] 21-1818 [Entered: 07/28/2021 02:45 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 5 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
4 4 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[3146331] 21-1818 [Entered: 07/28/2021 02:53 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Dina S. Kaplan, Esq. for Appellee Dina Kaplan, Gloria Marchetti-Bruck, Esq. for Appellee Gloria Marchetti-Bruck and Brian S. Weinstein for Appellee Brian Stryker Weinstein, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3146335] 21-1818 [Entered: 07/28/2021 02:57 PM]
Related: [-]