Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Patti B Saris
Referred: Donald L Cabell
Case #: 1:21-cv-11230
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2021
Terminated:May 30, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 25, 2022 3:37 AM EST
Defendant
Jennifer Fleming
in their capacity as members of the Town of Hull School Committee 58 Haborview Road
Hull, MA 02045
Represented By
Deborah I. Ecker
Kp Law, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Eric Hipp
in their capacity as members of the Town of Hull School Committee 29 K Street
Hull, MA 02045
Represented By
Deborah I. Ecker
Kp Law, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Lucas Patenaude
in their capacity as members of the Town of Hull School Committee 56 Whitehead Avenue
Hull, MA 02045
Represented By
Deborah I. Ecker
Kp Law, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Stephanie Peters
in their capacity as members of the Town of Hull School Committee 104 Highland Avenue
Hull, MA 02045
Represented By
Deborah I. Ecker
Kp Law, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Town of Hull School Committee
18 Harbor View Road
Hull, MA 02045
Represented By
Deborah I. Ecker
Kp Law, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Town of Hull, Massachusetts
253 Atlantic Avenue Hull
Hull, MA 02045
Represented By
Deborah I. Ecker
Kp Law, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
David Twombly
in their capacity as members of the Town of Hull School Committee 41 Kenberma Avenue
Hull, MA 02045
Represented By
Deborah I. Ecker
Kp Law, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Judge Robert B. Collings, M
Plaintiff
Michael Devine
1717 Ocean Street Apt 30D
Marshfield, MA 02050
Represented By
India L. Minchoff
Law Offices Of Russo & Minchoff
contact info


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Thursday, May 30, 2024
121 121 1 pgs order Settlement Order of Dismissal Thu 05/30 6:14 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (30 Days). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
120 120 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/29 7:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Kuzma on behalf of Michael Devine (Kuzma, Stephen)
Related: [-]
119 119 minutes Jury Trial - Held Wed 05/29 4:54 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Jury Trial DAY 2 (WED) held on 5/29/2024. P-3 Michael Devine testimony resumes. Court breaks for lunch 1 - 2:00 pm Case reported settled. Jury excused. All exhibits returned back to Plaintiffs Counsel. Clerk to issue a 30 Day Settlement Order, court adjourned. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) (mm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
118 118 minutes Jury Trial - Held Wed 05/29 12:06 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Jury Trial Day 1 (Tues) held on 5/28/2024. Voir Dire begins. 8 Jurors selected and sworn. Openings and Evidence begins. Joint Exhibits 1- 15 admitted. Plaintiff calls 1st witness. P-1 Jim Quatramoni - sworn. P-2 Margaret Ollerhead - sworn. P-3 Michael Devine - sworn. Court adjourned, jury excused. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) (mm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
117 117 notice Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Thu 05/23 2:56 PM
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at[LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/transcripts.htm] (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
116 116 misc Transcript Thu 05/23 2:56 PM
Transcript of Final Pretrial held on May 15, 2024, before Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at rhrbulldog@aol.com. Redaction Request due 6/13/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2024. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
115 115 4 pgs trial Witness List Thu 05/23 12:03 PM
JOINT TRIAL Witness List by Michael Devine. (Funnell, Emma)
Related: [-]
114 114 4 pgs trial Exhibit List Thu 05/23 12:03 PM
JOINT Exhibit List (CONTESTED) by Michael Devine.. (Funnell, Emma)
Related: [-]
113 113 3 pgs trial Exhibit List Thu 05/23 12:02 PM
JOINT Exhibit List by Michael Devine.. (Funnell, Emma)
Related: [-]