Case Filed:Jul 28, 2021
Last checked: Friday Jul 30, 2021 3:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Jordan Lowrie (1)
Represented By
Mark McMillian
Mark Mcmillian, Attorney At Law
contact info
Isaac Ralston Forman
Hissam Forman Donovan Ritchie
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Monica D. Coleman
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/30/2021 4:03 AM EDT
Thursday, February 04, 2021
1 1 SEALED MOTION by United States of America to Seal as to Jordan Lowrie. (btm)
Related: [-]
2 2 SEALED ORDER as to Jordan Lowrie granting1 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 2/4/2021. (cc: Judge, USA) (btm)
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT BY RELIABLE ELECTRONIC MEANS, with Affidavit in Support, as to Jordan Lowrie (1). (btm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
CASE UNSEALED as to Jordan Lowrie per defendant's arrest and judge's chambers. (tmr)
Related: [-]
ATTORNEY UPDATE in case as to Jordan Lowrie. Attorney Mark McMillian terminated pursuant to9 Order appointing Isaac Forman. (slr) [2:21-mj-00029]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION by United States of America for Detention Hearing as to Jordan Lowrie. (Coleman, Monica)
Related: [-]
6 6 WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED in case as to Jordan Lowrie. Defendant arrested on 4/15/2021. (tmr)
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Jordan Lowrie (arb)
Related: [-]
8 8 INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Jordan Lowrie held by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 4/16/2021; Court Reporter: Court Smart. (kab)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Upon hearing held 4/16/2021; directing that Mark McMillian shall represent the defendant for the initial appearance only; further directing that Isaac Forman is appointed to represent the defendant for all further proceedings; granting government's5 MOTION for Detention Hearing as to Jordan Lowrie; Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 4/21/2021 at 11:00 AM in Charleston before Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley; defendant remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 4/16/2021. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft) (tmr) (slr)
Related: [-]
10 10 DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER TO ALL COUNSEL REGARDING BRADY OBLIGATIONS as to Jordan Lowrie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 4/16/2021. (cc: Judge, counsel of record) (tmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
11 11 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Jordan Lowrie. (tmp)
Related: [-]
12 12 PRELIMINARY HEARING and DETENTION HEARING as to Jordan Lowrie held by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 4/21/2021; Court Reporter: Court Smart. (kab)
Related: [-]
13 13 WITNESS LIST by United States of America as to Jordan Lowrie, re: Hearing held 4/21/2021. (tmr)
Related: [-]
14 14 WAIVER OF A PRELIMINARY HEARING by Jordan Lowrie. (lca)
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER as to Jordan Lowrie Upon hearing held on 4/21/2021, defendant waived his right to a preliminary hearing; whereupon the Court found probable cause. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that defendant shall appear for further proceedings. Defendant was detained and remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 4/21/2021. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft) (arb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
16 16 WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED in case as to Jordan Lowrie. Defendant arrested on 4/15/2021. (kew)
Related: [-]
17 17 DETENTION ORDER as to Jordan Lowrie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 4/22/2021. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel) (lca)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
18 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict as to Jordan Lowrie(Forman, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Right to Be Indicted,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
19 19 ORDER Directing that the 30-day time frame for the return of an indictment is tolled as to defendant from 4/27/2021 through the next sitting of the grand jury in the Southern District of West Virginia as to Jordan Lowrie. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/26/2021. (cc: Judge, deft, counsel of record) (tmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
20 20 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict as to Jordan Lowrie(Forman, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Second Waiver of Right to Be Indicted,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
21 21 ORDER as to Jordan Lowrie The Court FINDS that the interests of justice outweigh the defendant's interest in speedy indictment in this case; therefore, IT IS ORDERED that the 30-day time frame for the return of an indictment is tolled as to defendant from 6/10/2021 through the next sitting of the grand jury in the Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 6/9/2021. (cc: deft and counsel; USA) (arb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
CASE as to Jordan Lowrie assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
Related: [-]
22 22 INDICTMENT as to Jordan Lowrie (1): Count 1. (msa)
Related: [-]
23 23 INDICTMENT - Unredacted Copy for Court Users Only as to Jordan Lowrie. (msa)
Related: [-]