DE FERNANDEZ et al v. CMA CGM S.A. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Melissa Damian |
Referred: | Panayotta D Augustin-Bir |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-22778 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 22:6082 Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity Act of 1996 |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 26, 2022 3:33 AM EST |
Defendant
CMA CGM S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CMA CGM (America) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emma Ruth Blanco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hebe Blanco Miyares
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacqueline M. Delgado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sergio Blanco De La Torre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guillermo Blanco De La Torre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Florentino Blanco De La Torre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eduardo Blanco De La Torre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Blanco De La Torre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph E. Bushman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lydia Blanco Bonafonte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susannah Valentina Blanco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Liana Maria Blanco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BYRON BLANCO, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
225 | 225
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 04/24 1:26 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING222 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff must respond to221 Defendants' Motion Seeking Order Compelling Production of Documents by Former Plaintiffs by April 30, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 4/24/2024. (sk01) |
|
224 | 224
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 04/24 1:19 PM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 4/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (sk01) |
|
223 | 223
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Wed 04/24 10:02 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (yar) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
222 | 222
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Thu 04/18 7:35 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to221 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiff and Former Plaintiffs by Odette Blanco De Fernandez.(Gaebe, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |