Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Angel Kelley
Case #: 1:21-cv-11240
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2021
Terminated:Apr 04, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 26, 2022 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
Carmen Aldinger
Defendant
Anders Brownworth
Defendant
Thomas Devol
Defendant
Harold Jones
Defendant
Doris Kellom
Defendant
Kristen Luken
Defendant
Roger Mark
Defendant
Ann McKay
Defendant
Newton Covenant Church
Defendant
Rosalind Picard
Defendant
Daniel Romaine
Defendant
Garrett Smith
Defendant
Beatrice Yankey
Plaintiff
Mark Saunders
28 Cushman Street
Watertown, MA 02472


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, June 09, 2023
49 49 misc USMS Process Receipt and Return Fri 06/09 11:49 AM
US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Service of Complaint. Harold Jones served on 12/24/22. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
48 48 misc Copy Mailed Thu 04/06 2:12 PM
Copy re 47 Order, Terminate Hearings, mailed to Mark Saunders on 4/6/23. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
47 47 order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 04/04 3:41 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In light of the filed46 Notice of Dismissal, the32 Assented to MOTION for Enlargement of Time for Service and35 Motion for Appointment of Counsel are DENIED AS MOOT . The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 4/12/23 is CANCELLED . (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
46 46 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/29 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal by Mark Saunders. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
45 45 misc Copy Mailed Mon 03/20 11:58 AM
Copy re44 Notice of Scheduling Conference, mailed to Mark Saunders on 3/20/23. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
44 44 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Mon 03/20 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: The parties are invited to submit a proposed pretrial schedule, per the attached sample, no later than 3 days before the Scheduling Conference. If the Court finds the parties' proposed deadlines reasonable or requiring only minor adjustments, it may enter a scheduling order in lieu of holding the Scheduling Conference. If the parties are unable to confer and submit a joint proposal, they are invited to submit individual proposed pretrial schedules, which the Court may consider and discuss during the Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2023 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Angel Kelley. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
43 43 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/13 9:37 AM
REPLY to Response to35 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Mark Saunders. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 02, 2023
42 42 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/02 1:03 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re35 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Harold Jones, Doris Kellom, Kristen Luken, Roger Mark, Ann McKay, Newton Covenant Church, Rosalind Picard, Daniel Romaine, Garrett Smith, Beatrice Yankey.(Kleinsasser, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
41 41 misc Copy Mailed Wed 03/01 4:14 PM
Copy re 40 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer mailed to Plaintiff on 3/1/2023. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
40 40 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/01 4:12 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 34 Defendants' Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 31, 2023 to File Response to12 Amended Complaint. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
39 39 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/24 2:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Saunders as to Garrett Smith. Waiver sent on 2/1/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
38 38 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/24 2:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Saunders as to Daniel Romaine. Waiver sent on 2/1/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
37 37 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/24 2:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Saunders as to Roger Mark. Waiver sent on 2/1/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice - Other Fri 02/24 2:15 PM
Notice Regarding Plaintiff's Filing of Defendants' Waivers of Service by Mark Saunders. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 02/24 2:06 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Mark Saunders. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
34 34 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/14 12:54 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 31, 2023 to File Response/Reply as to12 Amended Complaint, by Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Harold Jones, Doris Kellom, Kristen Luken, Roger Mark, Ann McKay, Newton Covenant Church, Rosalind Picard, Daniel Romaine, Garrett Smith, Beatrice Yankey.(Kleinsasser, Zachary)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/14 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary C. Kleinsasser on behalf of Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Harold Jones, Doris Kellom, Kristen Luken, Roger Mark, Ann McKay, Newton Covenant Church, Rosalind Picard, Daniel Romaine, Garrett Smith, Beatrice Yankey (Kleinsasser, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
32 32 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/31 8:48 AM
Assented to MOTION for Enlargement of Time for Service by Mark Saunders. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
31 31 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 01/24 4:23 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mark Saunders as to Roger Mark. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc USMS Process Receipt and Return Tue 01/24 4:18 PM
US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Amended Complaint. Beatrice Yankey served on 11/28/2022. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
29 29 misc Copy Mailed Wed 01/18 10:41 AM
Copy re 28 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, mailed to Plaintiff and Served Defendants on 1/18/2023. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/18 10:40 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING Assented-to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 15, 2023 to File Answer re12 Amended Complaint by Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Harold Jones, Doris Kellom, Kristen Luken, Ann McKay, Newton Covenant Church, Rosalind Picard, Beatrice Yankey. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/13 3:53 PM
Assented-to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 15, 2023 to File Answer re12 Complaint by Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Harold Jones, Doris Kellom, Kristen Luken, Ann McKay, Newton Covenant Church, Rosalind Picard, Beatrice Yankey. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
26 26 misc Copy Mailed Tue 12/20 9:36 AM
Copy re 25 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, mailed to Plaintiff and Served Defendants on 12/20/2022. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/20 9:34 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 24 Assented-to MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re12 Amended Complaint. Defendants MacKay, Lucken, DeVol, Aldinger, and Yankey's response due January 18, 2023. Defendant NCC's response due January 26, 2023. Defendants Picard and Bronworth's response due February 2, 2023. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/16 3:50 PM
Assented-to MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re12 Amended Complaint, by Carmen Aldinger, Anders Brownworth, Thomas Devol, Doris Kellom, Kristen Luken, Ann McKay, Newton Covenant Church, Beatrice Yankey. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/14 4:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rosalind Picard. Served on 12/7/2022, answer due 12/28/2022. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/14 3:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Newton Covenant Church. Served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/14 3:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Doris Kellom. Served on 12/13/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/14 3:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Anders Brownworth. Served on 12/7/2022, answer due 12/28/2022. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
19 19 misc Copy Mailed Tue 11/29 10:44 AM
Copy re 18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time mailed to Plaintiff on 11/29/2022. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 11/29 10:43 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The plaintiff's16 motion for extension of time for service is GRANTED . Service to be completed by January 13, 2023. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
17 17 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Thu 11/10 9:09 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mark Saunders in Support re16 MOTION for Extension of Time for Enlargement of Time for Service filed by Mark Saunders. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time Thu 11/10 9:07 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time for Enlargement of Time for Service by Mark Saunders.(Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
15 15 service Summons Issued Wed 08/10 10:41 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
14 14 utility Remark Wed 08/10 9:42 AM
Notice to Plaintiff re Service by USMS; Local Rule 4.1 (PSSA, 3)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/10 9:39 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered. Summonses to issue for all defendants. Plaintiff may ask USMS to complete service. Service must be completed within 90 days. (PSSA, 3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/17 3:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thomas Devol, Carmen Aldinger, Ann McKay, Harold Jones, Daniel Romaine, Rosalind Picard, Doris Kellom, Newton Covenant Church, Garrett Smith, Kristen Luken, Beatrice Yankey, Anders Brownworth, Roger Mark, filed by Mark Saunders. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 06/17 2:59 PM
RESPONSE TO7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mark Saunders. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/20 11:40 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall file a response by June 16, 2022. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
misc Copy Mailed Fri 05/20 11:42 AM
Copy re 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, mailed to Mark Saunders on 5/20/22. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/17 12:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 Order filed by Mark Saunders.(Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
7 7 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/12 1:44 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered granting6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Saunders shall, within thirty-five (35) days of the date of this order, show good cause why this action should not be dismissed for the reasons set forth above. Any show cause response shall include an amended complaint. Failure to comply with this directive will result in dismissal of the action. (PSSA, 3)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 11/01 3:31 PM
Renewed Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Saunders. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
notice Notice of Reassignment Tue 10/19 10:06 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Angel Kelley added. Judge Denise J. Casper no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/18 4:33 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Electronic order entered. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis2 is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff reports that he is unemployed and without any income and has limited amount of money. However, he also represents that he has monthly housing and utility expenses. Based on his statement of assets and income, it is unclear how Plaintiff is able to afford rent, utilities, or any other necessities of life (including food, transportation, and medical expenses). If Plaintiff wishes to pursue this action, he must, within fourteen (14) days, pay the $402 filing fee or file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Said motion must indicate how Plaintiff is able to pay or otherwise access the necessities of life. To the extent that Plaintiff receives monetary or in-kind gifts from other persons, he should disclose this income in the renewed motion. The Clerk shall provide Plaintiff an Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Plaintiff shall supplement this Application, as is necessary, to provide a complete statement of his income, assets, and any other relevant information showing how he is able to access the necessities of life. Failure to pay the filing fee or file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis within fourteen (14) days may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. (PSSA, 3)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 07/30 3:49 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 07/30 3:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Saunders.(Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/30 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark Saunders.(Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form