Nevada District Court
Judge:James C Mahan
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:21-cv-01426
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2021
Terminated:Mar 14, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 26, 2022 1:10 AM PST
Defendant
James Bertuccini
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Michael Young
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
David Valenta
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
John Susich
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Hamric Singh
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
James Rothenburg
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Coleman Oswald
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Melanie O'Daniel
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Wil Germosen
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Garth Findley
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Blake Dixon
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Burris
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Balint
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Ubbens
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Brittney Tomaso
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Szukiewicz
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Kyle Prior
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Patton
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
400 S. Martin Luther King Boulevartd
Las Vegas, NV 89106
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Defendant
Kasey Kirkegard
Represented By
Craig R. Anderson
Marquis & Aurbach
contact info
Plaintiff
Jasmine King
Represented By
Joshua L Benson
Benson Allred
contact info
Ronaldo Bumbasi
Bumbasi Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case Tue 03/14 11:51 AM
ORDER Granting24 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Main Document 25 replaced on 3/14/2023) (TRW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
24 24 motion Stipulation Tue 03/07 2:33 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL (Stipulation and Order to Dismiss with Prejudice) by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Craig) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
23 23 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Wed 11/09 3:44 PM
ORDER Granting22 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 3/7/2023. Motions due by 4/6/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/9/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
22 22 motion Stipulation Tue 11/08 4:18 PM
Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re Discovery Deadlines by Plaintiff Jasmine King. (Benson, Joshua) (extend) (discovery) Modified on 11/8/2022 (EDS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
21 21 notice Notice Change of Address Tue 07/19 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua L Benson. (Benson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Thu 06/16 4:21 PM
ORDER Granting19 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 1/6/2023. Motions due by 2/7/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
19 19 motion Stipulation Wed 06/15 2:07 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) of Discovery Deadlines re18 Order, by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Craig) Modified on 6/15/2022 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
18 18 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Wed 03/30 3:22 PM
ORDER Granting17 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 10/6/2022. Motions due by 11/7/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/30/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
17 17 motion Stipulation Tue 03/29 1:39 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery (Stipulation and Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines) by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
16 16 13 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 01/11 12:59 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting15 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
15 15 motion Stipulation Mon 01/10 2:18 PM
STIPULATION re Discovery (Protective Order) by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 11/18 8:43 AM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint,, filed by Ryan Balint, James Bertuccini, Matthew Burris, Blake Dixon, Garth Findley, Wil Germosen, Kasey Kirkegard, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Melanie O'Daniel, Coleman Oswald, Joseph Patton, Kyle Prior, James Rothenburg, Hamric Singh, John Susich, Joseph Szukiewicz, Brittney Tomaso, Andrew Ubbens, David Valenta, Michael Young.(Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
13 13 service Summons Issued Fri 10/29 12:25 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Bertuccini, Matthew Burris, Blake Dixon, Garth Findley, Wil Germosen, Melanie O'Daniel, Coleman Oswald, James Rothenburg, Hamric Singh, John Susich, David Valenta, Michael Young. (JQC)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Proposed Summons to be issued Fri 10/29 11:54 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Jasmine King. (Benson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
11 11 cmp Complaint Amended Fri 10/22 10:27 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ryan Balint, James Bertuccini, Matthew Burris, Blake Dixon, Garth Findley, Kasey Kirkegard, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Melanie O'Daniel, Coleman Oswald, Joseph Patton, Kyle Prior, James Rothenburg, Hamric Singh, Joseph Szukiewicz, Brittney Tomaso, Andrew Ubbens, David Valenta, Michael Young, John Susich, and Wil Germosen by Jasmine King. Adds new parties. (JQC) Modified on 10/22/2021 to add additional Defendant's names (SLD)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 10/22 10:22 AM
ORDER Granting9 Stipulation to Amend1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
9 9 motion Stipulation Thu 10/21 3:11 PM
STIPULATION to Amend1 Complaint (First Request), by Plaintiff Jasmine King. (Benson, Joshua) Modified on 10/21/2021 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
8 8 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Fri 10/01 9:06 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
7 7 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 10/01 9:06 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting6 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/6/2022. Motions due by 7/6/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/30/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
6 6 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 09/29 11:35 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jasmine King. (Benson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 09/07 12:59 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ryan Balint, Kasey Kirkegard, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Patton, Kyle Prior, Joseph Szukiewicz, Brittney Tomaso, Andrew Ubbens. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/07 12:58 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Ryan Balint, Kasey Kirkegard, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Patton, Kyle Prior, Joseph Szukiewicz, Brittney Tomaso, Andrew Ubbens. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/22/2021.(Anderson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 07/30 3:55 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants re1 Complaint. (MR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 07/30 2:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jasmine King. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Benson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/30 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6577403) by Jasmine King. Proof of service due by 10/28/2021. (Benson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons,
Att: 3 Summons Summons,
Att: 4 Summons Summons,
Att: 5 Summons Summons,
Att: 6 Summons Summons,
Att: 7 Summons Summons,
Att: 8 Summons Summons,
Att: 9 Summons Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 07/30 3:43 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
Related: [-]