Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Timothy J Savage
Case #: 2:21-cv-03419
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2021
Terminated:Jan 12, 2022
Last checked: Friday Jan 28, 2022 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
2111 ABIGAIL, LLC
Defendant
JIMMY G'S STEAKS
Defendant
NICHOLAS STRAFELLA
Plaintiff
CAMERON IRVING
Represented By
IAN M. BRYSON
Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER COLANERO
Terminated: 11/03/2021


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 01/12 8:31 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE THIS CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/12/22.1/12/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Show Cause Hearing Wed 01/12 8:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGEin Courtroom 9A Show Cause Hearing held on 1/11/22. Court Reporter: SUZANNE WHITE. (JL )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
16 16 misc Affidavit Fri 01/07 5:21 PM
AFFIDAVIT re15 Order,,, Terminate Hearings,,, Set Hearings,, by CAMERON IRVING.(BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 12/22 10:57 AM
ORDERED THAT THE HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE WHY JUDGMENT SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED AND TO ASSESS DAMAGES IS RESCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, JANUARY 11, 2022, AT 1:00 P.M., IN COURTROOM 9A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE COPIES OF THE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITH SUPPORTING DOCUMENTATION AND THIS ORDER UPON THE DEFENDANTS PERSONALLY AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED, AND BY REGULAR MAIL NO LATER THAN JANUARY 6, 2022. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE IN COMPLIANCE WITH THIS ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/21/2021. 12/22/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
14 14 misc Affidavit Tue 12/07 1:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT re12 Show Cause - Discipline,,13 Affidavit of Service/Affidavit of Ian M. Bryson, Esquire by CAMERON IRVING. (BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 26, 2021
13 13 misc Affidavit Fri 11/26 2:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT re12 Show Cause - Discipline,, Affidavit of Service/Affidavit of Ian M. Bryson, Esquire by CAMERON IRVING. (BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
12 12 order Show Cause - Discipline Fri 11/05 10:53 AM
ORDERED THAT A HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE WHY JUDGMENT SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED AND TO ASSESS DAMAGES IS SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, 12/7/21, AT 12:00PM, IN COURTROOM 9A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE COPIES OF THE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITH SUPPORTING DOCUMENTATION AND THIS ORDER UPON THEDEFENDANTS PERSONALLY AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED, AND BY REGULAR MAIL NO LATER THAN 11/26/21. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE IN COMPLIANCE WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/4/21. 11/5/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(bw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/03 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CAMERON IRVING As To Christopher Colanero(BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Default Judgment Wed 11/03 3:21 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Jimmy Gs Steaks, 2111 Abigail, LLC, and Nicholas Strafella filed by CAMERON IRVING.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 10/08 4:58 PM
DEFAULT BY 2111 ABIGAIL, LLC, CHRISTOPHER COLANERO, JIMMY G'S STEAKS, NICHOLAS STRAFELLA FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (sg, )
Related: [-]
misc Default Entered Fri 10/08 4:58 PM
Default Entered (sg, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
9 9 motion Entry of Default Thu 10/07 4:53 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Nicholas Strafella filed by CAMERON IRVING.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Entry of Default Thu 10/07 4:52 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant 2111 Abigail, LLC filed by CAMERON IRVING.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Entry of Default Thu 10/07 4:51 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Jimmy G's Steaks filed by CAMERON IRVING.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
6 6 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 10/05 10:45 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by CAMERON IRVING as to CHRISTOPHER COLANERO. (BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/05 10:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAMERON IRVING re: Michael Doyle served Summons and Complaint upon NICHOLAS STRAFELLA by Personal Service. NICHOLAS STRAFELLA served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. (BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/05 10:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAMERON IRVING re: Michael Doyle served Summons and Complaint upon 2111 ABIGAIL, LLC by Personal Service. 2111 ABIGAIL, LLC served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/05 10:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAMERON IRVING re: Michael Doyle served Summons and Complaint upon JIMMY G'S STEAKS by Personal Service. JIMMY G'S STEAKS served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/05 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS CASE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 4(m) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE UNLESS SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT IS MADE BY 10/30/2021. (aeg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
service Summons Issued Tue 08/03 9:41 AM
Summons Issued as to 2111 ABIGAIL, LLC, CHRISTOPHER COLANERO, JIMMY G'S STEAKS, NICHOLAS STRAFELLA. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 8/3/2021 (sg, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 01, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Sun 08/01 11:00 PM
COMPLAINT against 2111 ABIGAIL, LLC, CHRISTOPHER COLANERO, JIMMY G'S STEAKS, NICHOLAS STRAFELLA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15305599.), filed by CAMERON IRVING.(BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form
misc Jury Demand Tue 08/03 7:49 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CAMERON IRVING. (JL )
Related: [-]