Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Juan R Sanchez
Case #: 2:21-cv-03425
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2021
Terminated:May 26, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jan 29, 2022 3:39 AM EST
Defendant
BERGER RENTAL COMMUNITIES
Represented By
KIMBERLY L. RUSSELL
Kaplin Stewart Meloff Reiter & Stein
contact info
Defendant
PA MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE CORP
Represented By
KIMBERLY L. RUSSELL
Kaplin Stewart Meloff Reiter & Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
JUNIOR MAYERS
Represented By
MARC A. WEINBERG
Saffren And Weinberg
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, May 26, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Thu 05/26 9:38 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/26/22. 5/26/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
12 12 minutes Telephone Conference Fri 05/13 12:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Re: A Telephone Conference was held on 5/11/22. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
11 11 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 12/02 4:01 PM
ORDER THAT DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/1/2022. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 4/5/2022. A TELECONFERENCE TO DISCUSS SETTLEMENT SHALL TAKE PLACE ON 5/11/2022 AT 3:00 P.M. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 5/17/2022. PLAINTIFF'S PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/2/2022. DEFENDANT'S PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/2/2022. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/6/2022 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 14B. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 6/13/2022, ETC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/1/21. 12/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
10 10 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Thu 11/25 10:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Pretrial/RULE 16 Conference held on 11/22/21. (JL )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 11/12 1:45 PM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 11/22/21 AT 10:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/12/21. 11/12/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 28, 2021
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/28 9:38 AM
ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by BERGER RENTAL COMMUNITIES, PA MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE CORP.(RUSSELL, KIMBERLY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 10/14 1:43 PM
ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLFF'S COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 5) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/14/21.10/14/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
6 6 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/13 12:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JUNIOR MAYERS. (WEINBERG, MARC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 09/01 12:01 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BERGER RENTAL COMMUNITIES, PA MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE CORP.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(RUSSELL, KIMBERLY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/26 2:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUNIOR MAYERS re: Francis DiMeo, III served Summons and Complaint upon PA MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE CORP by Corporate. PA MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE CORP served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (WEINBERG, MARC)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/26 2:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUNIOR MAYERS re: Francis DeiMeo, III served Summons and Complaint upon BERGER RENTAL COMMUNITIES by Corporate. BERGER RENTAL COMMUNITIES served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (WEINBERG, MARC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
2 2 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/10 1:11 PM
ORDER THAT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S PROCEDURE FOR ASSIGNMENT OF A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO CERTAIN DISTRICT COURT JUDGES ON A ROTATING BASIS, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE RICHARD A. LLORET. SIGNED BY KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/10/21. 8/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 08/02 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT against BERGER RENTAL COMMUNITIES, PA MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE CORP ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15306987.), filed by JUNIOR MAYERS.(WEINBERG, MARC)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Mon 08/02 4:09 PM
Summons Issued as to BERGER RENTAL COMMUNITIES, PA MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE CORP. E-Mailed To: counsel on 8/2/21. (kw, )
Related: [-]