Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey J Helmick
Case #: 3:21-cv-01495
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2021
Terminated:Sep 13, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jan 29, 2022 4:52 AM EST
Defendant
Mary Shepherd
Represented By
Robert R. Lech
contact info
Plaintiff
Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Michael E. Dockins
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick - Toledo
contact info
David P. Strup
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick - Toledo
contact info
Plaintiff
First 2 Market Products, LLC
1070 Commerce Drive Building 4
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Michael E. Dockins
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick - Toledo
contact info
David P. Strup
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick - Toledo
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
10 10 oth_doc Report Regarding Patent or Trademark Action - AO120 Tue 09/14 1:23 PM
Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120).(W,Na)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
Monday, September 13, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 09/13 11:01 AM
Order of Case Dismissal without prejudice. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/13/2021. (S,AL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 09/08 4:02 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Strup, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
7 7 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 08/25 1:15 PM
Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Defendant Mary Shepherd. Related document(s)1 .(Lech, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mary Shepherd
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 08/25 1:11 PM
Attorney Appearance by Robert R. Lech filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Lech, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Thu 08/05 9:52 AM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon Mary Shepherd on 8/4/2021, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s)1 . (Strup, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
4 4 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 08/02 1:48 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Mary Shepherd. (M,L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
3 3 oth_doc Report Regarding Patent or Trademark Action - AO120 Mon 08/02 11:37 AM
Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Strup, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 08/02 11:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Strup, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/02 11:29 AM
Complaint with jury demand against Mary Shepherd. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10962273.. Filed by Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd., First 2 Market Products, LLC. (Strup, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 696 Patent,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exclusive Distribution Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Photos of Gripstic packaging,
Att: 4 Exhibit Registration Certificate,
Att: 5 Exhibit Defendant's photos,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet,
Att: 7 Summons Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 08/02 1:40 PM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 08/02 1:42 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (M,L)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Mon 08/02 1:49 PM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Link to Local Patent Rules Mon 08/02 1:50 PM
This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to [LINK:Local Patent Rules] . (M,L)
Related: [-]