California Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Mendez
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:21-cv-01362
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2021
Terminated:Jun 23, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 29, 2022 12:38 AM PST
Defendant
County of Yolo
Represented By
Philip J Pogledich
Yolo County Counsel
contact info
Derek P. Cole
Cole Huber LLP
contact info
Defendant
Yolo County Board of Supervisors
Represented By
Philip J Pogledich
Yolo County Counsel
contact info
Derek P. Cole
Cole Huber LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Granite Construction Company
Represented By
Mark D. Harrison
Harrison, Temblador, Hungerford And Johnson
contact info
Adam K. Guernsey
Harrison, Temblador, Hungerford And Guernsey
contact info
Russell Frink
Harrison, Temblador, Hungerford And Johnson
contact info

GPO Aug 04 2021
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/3/2021 authorizing electronic service of documents. (Zignago, K.)
GPO Feb 15 2022
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/14/2022 DENYING 13 Motion to Compel without prejudice and VACATING the hearing. (Coll, A)
GPO Mar 21 2022
dge John A. Mendez. All other deadlines identified in, and requirements of, the Court's 11 Pretrial Scheduling Order shall remain the same. (Reader, L)ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/18/2022 EXTENDING Discovery cutoff to 7/14/2022. Joint Mid-Litigation Statements by 14 days prior to the new discovery cutoff date. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/20/2022, The hearing date for any dispositive motions shall be 1/10/2023, at 1:30 PM. Trial CONTINUED to 4/3/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 2/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Ju
GPO Mar 24 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/23/2022 MODIFYING 11 Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows: Discovery cutoff is 8/14/2022, Joint Mid-Litigation Statements by 14 days prior to the new discovery cutoff date, Dispositive Motions filed by 11/18/2022, with Hearing on 1/24/2023 at 1:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez, and Jury Trial set for 4/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. All other deadlines identified in, and requirements of, 11 Pretrial Scheduling Order shall remain the same. (Huang, H)
GPO Jun 01 2022
AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/31/22 MODIFYING 18 Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows: Joint Mid-Litigation Statements due 14 days prior to the close of discovery, Discovery cutoff is 1/31/23, Dispositive Motions filed by 3/31/23, with Hearing on 6/6/23 at 1:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/23 at 10:00 AM, and Trial set for 8/28/23 at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Dec 07 2022
AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 12/06/2022 MODIFYING 21 Pretrial Scheduling order as follows: Joint Mid-Litigation Statements due 14 days prior to the close of discovery, Discovery Cutoff is 4/28/2023, Dispositive Motions filed by 6/30/2023, with Motion Hearing on August 22, 2023 at 1:30PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez and Trial set for 12/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. (Rodriguez, E)
GPO Apr 18 2023
aring 11/14/2023 at 1:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez, and Trial set for 3/4/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez.(Reader, L)ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 4/17/2023 CONTINUING Joint Mid-Litigation Statement Filing Deadline, is 14 days prior to the close of discovery. Discovery due by 7/28/2023. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/15/2023. Dispositive Motion He
GPO Jun 23 2023
ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 6/22/2023 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to the terms of the Settlement Agreement, and all previously set hearing dates are VACATED. CASE CLOSED. (Reader, L)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, June 23, 2023
29 29 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 06/23 8:57 AM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 6/22/2023 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to the terms of the Settlement Agreement, and all previously set hearing dates are VACATED. CASE CLOSED. Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Thursday, June 22, 2023
28 28 misc Stipulation Thu 06/22 11:22 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Dismissal by Granite Construction Company. (Frink, Russell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
27 27 4 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/18 10:35 AM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 4/17/2023 CONTINUING Joint Mid-Litigation Statement Filing Deadline, is 14 days prior to the close of discovery. Discovery due by 7/28/2023. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/15/2023. Dispositive Motion Hearing 11/14/2023 at 1:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez, and Trial set for 3/4/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Monday, April 17, 2023
26 26 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 04/17 12:39 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modification of Pretrial Scheduling Order by Granite Construction Company. (Frink, Russell)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
25 25 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 04/14 10:50 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Pretrial Scheduling Order by Granite Construction Company. (Hungerford, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
24 24 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 12/07 11:56 AM
AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 12/06/2022 MODIFYING21 Pretrial Scheduling order as follows: Joint Mid-Litigation Statements due 14 days prior to the close of discovery, Discovery Cutoff is 4/28/2023, Dispositive Motions filed by 6/30/2023, with Motion Hearing on August 22, 2023 at 1:30PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez and Trial set for 12/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. (Rodriguez, E)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
23 23 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 12/05 1:39 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modification of Pretrial Scheduling Order by Granite Construction Company. (Hungerford, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
22 22 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 11/09 11:49 AM
[DISREGARD; noncompliant] STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER modifying the Pretrial Scheduling Order by Granite Construction Company. (Hungerford, Sean) Modified on 11/9/2022 (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
21 21 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 06/01 11:55 AM
AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/31/22 MODIFYING18 Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows: Joint Mid-Litigation Statements due 14 days prior to the close of discovery, Discovery cutoff is 1/31/23, Dispositive Motions filed by 3/31/23, with Hearing on 6/6/23 at 1:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/23 at 10:00 AM, and Trial set for 8/28/23 at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
20 20 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 05/26 12:28 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modification of Pretrial Scheduling Order re18 Stipulation and Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, by Granite Construction Company. (Hungerford, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
19 19 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 05/24 12:58 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modification of Pretrial Scheduling Order re18 Stipulation and Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, by Granite Construction Company. Attorney Hungerford, Sean K. added. (Hungerford, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
18 18 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 03/24 9:20 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/23/2022 MODIFYING11 Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows: Discovery cutoff is 8/14/2022, Joint Mid-Litigation Statements by 14 days prior to the new discovery cutoff date, Dispositive Motions filed by 11/18/2022, with Hearing on 1/24/2023 at 1:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez, and Jury Trial set for 4/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. All other deadlines identified in, and requirements of,11 Pretrial Scheduling Order shall remain the same. (Huang, H)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
17 17 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 03/22 4:24 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for MODIFYING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER re11 Scheduling Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,,15 Stipulation and Proposed Order,16 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, by County of Yolo. (Cole, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
16 16 4 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Mon 03/21 10:06 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/18/2022 EXTENDING Discovery cutoff to 7/14/2022. Joint Mid-Litigation Statements by 14 days prior to the new discovery cutoff date. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/20/2022, The hearing date for any dispositive motions shall be 1/10/2023, at 1:30 PM. Trial CONTINUED to 4/3/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 2/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. All other deadlines identified in, and requirements of, the Court's11 Pretrial Scheduling Order shall remain the same. Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Friday, March 18, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/18 11:10 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Pre-Trial Scheduling re11 Scheduling Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, by County of Yolo. (Cole, Derek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Compel Tue 02/15 9:15 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/14/2022 DENYING13 Motion to Compel without prejudice and VACATING the hearing. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
13 13 motion Compel Thu 02/03 4:59 PM
MOTION to COMPEL Production of Documents by Granite Construction Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Frink, Russell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/29 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE by Granite Construction Company. (Frink, Russell)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
11 11 order Scheduling Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Mon 10/04 10:18 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/1/2021 ORDERING: Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/11/2022, with Supplemental Disclosures due by 2/27/2022, Joint Mid-Litigation Statement due 14 days prior to the close of discovery, Discovery to be completed by 4/15/2022, Dispositive Motions filed by 7/22/2022, to be heard on 9/13/2022 at 1:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez, with a Joint Pretrial Statement due 7 days prior, Jury Trial set for 12/5/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 7 days of the date of the filing of this Order. (Huang, H)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
10 10 misc Status Report Fri 10/01 2:55 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Granite Construction Company. (Frink, Russell)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 23, 2021
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/23 4:06 PM
ANSWER by County of Yolo, Yolo County Board of Supervisors. Attorney Cole, Derek P. added.(Cole, Derek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/11 12:34 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Frink, Russell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
service Service by Mail Thu 08/05 9:24 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:7 Stipulation and Order served on Philip J. Pogledich at address for County Counsel. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Wed 08/04 9:04 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/3/2021 authorizing electronic service of documents. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
6 6 service Certificate of Service Tue 08/03 1:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Granite Construction Company. (Frink, Russell)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service Tue 08/03 1:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Granite Construction Company. (Frink, Russell)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 08/03 12:39 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Authorization of Electronic Service of Documents by Granite Construction Company. (Frink, Russell)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for JAM Mon 08/02 1:47 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 Order re Filing Requirements,
Att: 3 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Mon 08/02 1:46 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Yolo, Yolo County Board of Supervisors* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Adam K. Guernsey* *2801 T Street* *Sacramento, CA 95816*. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
1 1 287 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/02 1:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Granite Construction Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9741253)(Frink, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover,
Att: 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement