Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Brantley Starr
Case #: 3:21-cv-01788
Nature of Suit625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881
Cause21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2021
Terminated:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 29, 2022 2:41 AM CST
Claimant
Willando Clark
Represented By
Frank Sellers
Westfall Sellers
contact info
Defendant
$67,000 in United States Currency
Plaintiff
United States of America
U.S. Attorney's Office 1100 Commerce Suite 300
Dallas, TX 75242
Represented By
Dimitri Narciso Rocha-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Mar 15 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: As an initial matter, the Court DENIES the 56 motion for leave to file appendix. The Government demonstrated in its pleadings and at the hearing that it did not illegally detain Willando Clark or illegally seize his items, and therefore, the Court DENIES Clark's 38 motion to suppress. However, the Government failed to demonstrate that there is no genuine dispute of material fact, and therefore, the Court DENIES the Government's 32 motion for summary judgment. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 3/15/2023) (twd)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
109 109 misc Costs Taxed Tue 06/25 3:47 PM
Costs Taxed in amount of $ 2373.86 against Willando Clark. (agc)
Related: [-]