Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael J Mcshane
Case #: 6:21-cv-01139
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2021
Terminated:Mar 23, 2023
Case in other court:Circuit Court of the State of Oregon County of Lan, 21 CV 23009
Last checked: Sunday Jan 30, 2022 1:35 AM PST
Defendant
Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas N. Abbott
Perkins Coie, LLP
contact info
Defendant
April Curtis
Represented By
Kenji Kozuma
Kozuma Law LLC
contact info
Christopher R. Burke
Mkb Lawyers
contact info
Defendant
Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By
Thomas N. Abbott
Perkins Coie, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mediation Case Manager
Represented By
Kenji Kozuma
Kozuma Law LLC
contact info
Christopher R. Burke
Mkb Lawyers
contact info
Defendant
Annette Phelps
Represented By
Kenji Kozuma
Kozuma Law LLC
contact info
Christopher R. Burke
Mkb Lawyers
contact info
Defendant
Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington
Represented By
John M. Thomas
Mccarthy & Holthus
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Burke
Represented By
Kenji Kozuma
Kozuma Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By
Thomas N. Abbott
Perkins Coie, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Merri Sue Clark
1810 Cameo Drive
Eugene, OR 97405
Represented By
Robert A. Swider
Swider Haver LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard W. Clark
1810 Cameo Dr.
Eugene, OR 97405
Represented By
Robert A. Swider
Swider Haver LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Canopy Software, Inc.
Terminated: 12/27/2021
Represented By
Kenji Kozuma
Kozuma Law LLC
contact info
Christopher R. Burke
Mkb Lawyers
contact info
Defendant
LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Terminated: 12/27/2021
Represented By
Thomas N. Abbott
Perkins Coie, LLP
contact info
Defendant
LSF9 Mortgage Holdings, LLC
Terminated: 12/27/2021
Represented By
Thomas N. Abbott
Perkins Coie, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Courtney Ruiz
Terminated: 12/27/2021
Represented By
Thomas N. Abbott
Perkins Coie, LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 10 2021
ORDER: Plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order, 8 is denied. Signed on 8/10/2021 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 8/11/2021.) (cp)
GPO Mar 23 2023
Opinion and Order: Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, ECF No. 15, is DENIED. The Motions to Dismiss, ECF Nos. 7, 16, 41, and 58, are GRANTED. Defendants' Motions to Strike, ECF Nos. 53, 54, 59, are GRANTED. U.S. Banks Request for Judicial Notice, ECF No. 41-1, and Caliber's Request for Judicial Notice, ECF No. 16-1, are GRANTED. Canopy's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, ECF No. 64, is GRANTED. Any remaining motions are DENIED as moot. Signed on 3/23/2023 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/23/2023.) (cp)
GPO Jul 20 2023
Opinion and Order: Defendants' Motion for Fees and Costs, ECF No. 85, is GRANTED. Defendants are awarded $402.00 in costs. U.S. Bank is awarded $72,913.20 in attorney fees. Caliber is awarded $40,155.67 in attorney fees. Signed on 7/20/2023 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 7/20/2023.) (cp)

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
97 97 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion Thu 05/01 9:38 AM
USCA Memorandum for the 9th Circuit, USCA 23-35275 23-35554 re Notice of Appeal89 and Notice of Appeal94 . The decision of the District Court is: AFFIRMED. (jw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Post Judgment Form