Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Janet S Baer
Case #: 1:21-bk-09243
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2021
Creditor Meeting:Aug 30, 2021
Terminated:Sep 19, 2022

Debtor
Sackett Automated Parking Systems, LLC
1033 Bryn Mawr Ave.
Bensenville, IL 60106
Represented By
John H Redfield
Crane, Simon, Clar & Goodman
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Gina B Krol
Cohen & Krol 105 West Madison St Ste 1100
Chicago, IL 60602
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 08/04/2021 12:02 AM CDT
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a) Tue 08/03 2:00 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by John H Redfield on behalf of Sackett Automated Parking Systems, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] dfield, John
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 08/03 2:02 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 21-09243 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A43760599. Fee Amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] dfield, JohnDoc#1
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation) Tue 08/03 2:36 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/30/2021 at 01:00 PM at Appear By VIDEO. See details www.justice.gov/ust-regions-r11/region-11-northern-district-illinois. (Auto Assign, Admin)
Related: [-]