California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:19-cv-01935
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2019
Terminated:Oct 08, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 04, 2021 8:07 PM PDT
Defendant
Intel Corporation
Defendant
McAfee Public Sector, LLC
Defendant
McAfee, LLC
Plaintiff
Rima Gerendas
Represented By
Raphael M. Garland
contact info
Jay P. Holland
Joseph Greenwald Laake, P.A.
contact info
Dave Scher
Hoyer Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Jonathan H Gold
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Neill Tai Tseng
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Sara Winslow
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
David Gerendas
Terminated: 10/31/2019
Represented By
Raphael M. Garland
contact info
Jay P. Holland
Joseph Greenwald Laake, P.A.
contact info
Dave Scher
Hoyer Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, October 08, 2021
31 31 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/08 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rima Gerendas (Scher, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
30 30 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 08/04 3:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re29 Notice of Appearance (Tseng, Neill)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/03 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neill Tai Tseng (Tseng, Neill)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
28 28 ORDER granting 27 to Unseal Certain Documents. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/26/2021. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/26/2021 (jhfS, COURT STAFF).Copy faxed via email to counsel 7/26/21.
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
27 27 NOTICE of election to decline intervention [proposed] Order to unseal by United States of America (cvS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/23/2021 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
14 14 ORDER GRANTING 12 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBSTITUTE A PROPER PLAINTIFF. The Clerk is directed to substitute Rima Gerendas, administrator of the estate of David Steven Gerendas, as one of the plaintiffs in this action. The Clerk is further ordered to amend the caption of this case accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/31/19. (cfeS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
2 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (rcsS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 50 pgs COMPLAINT against Intel Corporation, McAfee Public Sector, LLC, McAfee, LLC (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt #34611141738) Filed by David Gerendas. Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2019.(rcsS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet