Colorado District Court
Judge:Christine M Arguello
Referred: Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:21-cv-02112
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jan 31, 2022 1:28 AM MST
Defendant
Burton Corporation, The
Represented By
Bryan S. Conley
Wolf Greenfield & Sacks Pc-Boston
contact info
Marie A. McKiernan
Wolf Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf Greenfield & Sacks Pc-Boston
contact info
Scott Robert Bialecki
Sheridan Ross, P.C.
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, P.C.
contact info
Claire E. Schuster
Wolf Greenfield & Sacks Pc-Boston
contact info
Robert R. Brunelli
Sheridan Ross, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Koroyd Sarl
Represented By
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey & Whitney Llp-Salt Lake City
contact info
Maral Shoaei
Dorsey & Whitney Llp-Denver
contact info
Elliot James Hales
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Gregory Scot Tamkin
Dorsey & Whitney Llp-Denver
contact info
Erin Cooke Kolter
Dorsey & Whitney Llp-Seattle
contact info
Plaintiff
Smith Sport Optics, Inc.
Represented By
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey & Whitney Llp-Salt Lake City
contact info
Maral Shoaei
Dorsey & Whitney Llp-Denver
contact info
Elliot James Hales
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Gregory Scot Tamkin
Dorsey & Whitney Llp-Denver
contact info
Erin Cooke Kolter
Dorsey & Whitney Llp-Seattle
contact info

GPO Oct 19 2022
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay 78 is GRANTED. The stay is hereby lifted, and this case is REOPENED for further proceedings. Plaintiffs' Motion for Oral Argument Re: Motion to Lift Stay 87 is DENIED as the Court has determined oral argument is not necessary at this time. The parties are DIRECTED to contact Magistrate Judge Crews' Chambers for resetting of pertinent deadlines. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/19/2022. (sphil, )
GPO May 22 2023
ORDER re 94 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. For the reasons stated herein, the Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED this matter is set for a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on 6/8/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The proposed order is due on or before 6/1/2023. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/22/2023. (skclc1)
GPO Oct 13 2023
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply 118 is DENIED. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/13/2023.(sphil, )
GPO Aug 20 2024
024.(sphil, )ORDER: Parties' Joint Motion for Determination of Claim Construction 123 is GRANTED. The disputed claim terms of U.S. Patent No. 10,736,373; are hereby CONSTRUED as set forth herein. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/20/2

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
170 170 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 04/30 7:44 AM
ORDER: Granting169 Second Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Dismiss Case After Settlement. The parties are DIRECTED to file appropriate dismissal documents in this matter by NO LATER THAN 5/30/2025. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/30/2025. Text Only Entry(cmasec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
169 169 motion Extension of Time Tue 04/29 12:48 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Dismiss Case After Settlement (Second) by Plaintiffs Smith Sport Optics, Inc., Koroyd Sarl.(Miller, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)