Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:21-cv-01129
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2021
Terminated:Sep 01, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jan 30, 2022 5:33 AM EST
Defendant
Freshly Picked, LLC
Represented By
Karen Jacobs
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Andrew Mark Moshos
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Cameron Paul Clark
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hindi R. Zeidman
Represented By
Megan C. Haney
Phillips, Goldman, Mclaughlin & Hall, P.A.
contact info
John C. Phillips, Jr.
Phillips, Mclaughlin & Hall, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 01, 2022
30 30 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Thu 09/01 2:44 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE 48,330.(kmd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice
29 29 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 09/01 2:43 PM
SO ORDERED, re28 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Hindi R. Zeidman. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/1/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/31 5:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Hindi R. Zeidman. (Haney, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 08/22 8:39 AM
SO ORDERED, re27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to September 2, 2022, filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 9/2/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/22/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
27 27 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 08/19 4:22 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to September 2, 2022 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Clark, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 08/08 9:33 AM
SO ORDERED, re26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to August 19, 2022, filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 8/19/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/8/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
26 26 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 08/04 5:12 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to August 19, 2022 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Clark, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
25 25 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 07/22 3:14 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to August 5, 2022 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Jacobs, Karen)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 07/22 3:23 PM
SO ORDERED, re25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to August 5, 2022, filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 8/5/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/22/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
24 24 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 06/30 2:35 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to July 22, 2022 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Clark, Cameron)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 06/30 3:24 PM
SO ORDERED, re24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to July 22, 2022, filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 7/22/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/30/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
23 23 notice Notice - Other Fri 06/17 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Freshly Picked, LLC re 15 MOTION to Dismiss (Clark, Cameron)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel Fri 06/17 4:43 PM
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Nicole Townes as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer affiliated with the case. (Haney, Megan)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/17 1:53 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marko R. Zoretic - filed by Hindi R. Zeidman.(Haney, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Marko R. Zoretic
order SO ORDERED Fri 06/17 1:55 PM
SO ORDERED, re21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marko R. Zoretic, filed by Hindi R. Zeidman. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/17/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 06/17 4:22 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marko R. Zoretic for Hindi R. Zeidman added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
20 20 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Fri 06/03 4:32 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hindi R. Zeidman.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/10/2022. (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
19 19 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 05/16 9:08 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 15) and Defendant to File its Reply Brief to June 3, 2022 and June 17, 2022 - filed by Hindi R. Zeidman. (Haney, Megan)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Mon 05/16 10:02 AM
SO ORDERED, re19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 15) and Defendant to File its Reply Brief to June 3, 2022 and June 17, 2022, filed by Hindi R. Zeidman. Re-Set Briefing Schedule: re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Answering Brief due 6/3/2022. Reply Brief due 6/17/2022.Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/16/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/06 4:03 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clinton E. Duke and Sarah W. Matthews - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Jacobs, Karen)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 05/06 3:58 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent FPH Holdco, LLC, Other Affiliate SEP V FP Holdings, Other Affiliate Freshly Picked, Inc., Other Affiliate MagnetBlox, LLC, Other Affiliate Eric Child, Other Affiliate Reed Quinn, Other Affiliate Christopher Quinn, Other Affiliate Derek Rowley, Other Affiliate Taylor Johnson, Other Affiliate SEP V FP Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Seidler Equity Partners V, L.P. for Freshly Picked, LLC filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Jacobs, Karen)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Fri 05/06 3:39 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Freshly Picked, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/20/2022. (Jacobs, Karen)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Fri 05/06 3:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Jacobs, Karen)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Fri 05/06 4:11 PM
SO ORDERED, re18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clinton E. Duke and Sarah W. Matthews, filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/6/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 04/07 8:24 AM
SO ORDERED, re14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to May 6, 2022, filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 5/6/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/7/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
14 14 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 04/06 6:14 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to May 6, 2022 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Clark, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
13 13 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 03/07 4:49 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to April 6, 2022 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Clark, Cameron)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 03/07 4:53 PM
SO ORDERED, re13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to April 6, 2022, filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 4/6/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/7/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
12 12 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 02/04 11:56 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to March 7, 2022 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Clark, Cameron)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 02/04 12:01 PM
SO ORDERED, re12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to March 7, 2022, filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 3/7/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/4/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 01/03 11:24 AM
SO ORDERED, re11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to February 4, 2022 filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 2/4/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/3/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
11 11 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 12/28 11:18 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to February 4, 2022 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Jacobs, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 12/01 8:24 AM
SO ORDERED, re10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 4, 2022, filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 1/4/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/1/2021. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
10 10 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 11/30 4:57 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Freshly Picked, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 4, 2022 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Clark, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
9 9 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 10/27 10:49 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to December 1, 2021 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Jacobs, Karen)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 10/27 11:09 AM
SO ORDERED, re9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to December 1, 2021 filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 12/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/27/2021. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
8 8 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 09/28 11:09 AM
Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to November 1, 2021 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Jacobs, Karen)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 09/28 3:39 PM
SO ORDERED, re8 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to November 1, 2021 filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 11/1/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/28/2021. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
7 7 notice Notice - Other Fri 09/24 6:00 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Andrew M. Moshos) by Freshly Picked, LLC (Moshos, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
6 6 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 08/26 11:34 AM
Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to October 1, 2021 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Moshos, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 08/26 11:53 AM
SO ORDERED, re6 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to October 1, 2021 filed by Freshly Picked, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 10/1/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/26/2021. (nmf)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/13 2:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hindi R. Zeidman. Freshly Picked, LLC served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Haney, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/11 10:00 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 08/04 8:12 AM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Freshly Picked, LLC on 8/4/2021. (twk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Wed 08/04 8:10 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE 48, 330. (twk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Wed 08/04 8:09 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/04 8:09 AM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Freshly Picked, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3671525.) - filed by Hindi R. Zeidman.(twk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet