CLARK v. HIRE QUEST, LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-22851 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Aug 04, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 27, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 31, 2022 4:26 AM EST |
Defendant
HIRE QUEST, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TRAVIS WALLACE
|
|
Defendant
WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE CLARK
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, December 27, 2021 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 12/27 8:59 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice pursuant to12 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
||
Wednesday, December 22, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JACQUELINE CLARK (Miller, Caroline) |
|
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION re8 Stipulation of Dismissal For Dismissal and Compelling Arbitration by WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.(Pollock, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Howard Pollock on behalf of WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.. Attorney Brian Howard Pollock added to party WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.(pty:dft). (Pollock, Brian) |
|
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leslie Lagomasino Baum on behalf of HIRE QUEST, LLC. Attorney Leslie Lagomasino Baum added to party HIRE QUEST, LLC(pty:dft). (Baum, Leslie) |
|
8 | 8
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Hire Quest, LLC (filed jointly) by HIRE QUEST, LLC(Penichet, Paul) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 14, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.. (Pollock, Brian) |
|
Monday, September 13, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.. WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Pollock, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, August 11, 2021 | ||
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Wed 08/11 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
||
Tuesday, August 10, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JACQUELINE CLARK. HIRE QUEST, LLC waiver sent on 8/10/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Miller, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to HIRE QUEST, LLC, TRAVIS WALLACE, WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. (pes) |
|
Wednesday, August 04, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against HIRE QUEST, LLC, TRAVIS WALLACE, WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14901794, filed by JACQUELINE CLARK.(Miller, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 08/05 8:04 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes) |