Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Case #: 1:21-cv-22851
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2021
Terminated:Dec 27, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jan 31, 2022 4:26 AM EST
Defendant
HIRE QUEST, LLC
Represented By
Paul Fernandez Penichet
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Leslie Lagomasino Baum
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
TRAVIS WALLACE
Defendant
WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.
Represented By
Brian Howard Pollock
Fairlaw Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE CLARK
Represented By
Caroline Hope Miller
Derek Smith Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, December 27, 2021
order Order Dismissing Case Mon 12/27 8:59 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice pursuant to12 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Wed 12/22 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JACQUELINE CLARK (Miller, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 10/15 5:54 PM
STIPULATION re8 Stipulation of Dismissal For Dismissal and Compelling Arbitration by WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.(Pollock, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 10/12 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Howard Pollock on behalf of WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.. Attorney Brian Howard Pollock added to party WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.(pty:dft). (Pollock, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 10/08 5:58 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leslie Lagomasino Baum on behalf of HIRE QUEST, LLC. Attorney Leslie Lagomasino Baum added to party HIRE QUEST, LLC(pty:dft). (Baum, Leslie)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Fri 10/08 5:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Hire Quest, LLC (filed jointly) by HIRE QUEST, LLC(Penichet, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/14 2:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.. (Pollock, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 09/13 12:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.. WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Pollock, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Wed 08/11 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/10 5:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JACQUELINE CLARK. HIRE QUEST, LLC waiver sent on 8/10/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Miller, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 08/05 8:09 AM
Summons Issued as to HIRE QUEST, LLC, TRAVIS WALLACE, WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. (pes)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/04 6:15 PM
COMPLAINT against HIRE QUEST, LLC, TRAVIS WALLACE, WECHSLER CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14901794, filed by JACQUELINE CLARK.(Miller, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s),
Att: 4 Summon(s)
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 08/05 8:04 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
Related: [-]