New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Case #: 1:21-cv-04408
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2021
Terminated:May 27, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, June 24, 2022
20 20 1 pgs order Order Re: Attorneys Fees Fri 06/24 1:20 PM
Stipulation and Order Re: EAJA attorneys fees. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/24/2022. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Attorney Fees Fri 06/24 1:10 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Rei Corcoran. (Keller, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order and Stipulation for Payment of Attorney Fees pursuant to the EAJA
order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Fri 06/24 1:18 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting the parties joint motion19 for EAJA attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/24/2022. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
18 18 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 05/27 1:19 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the final decision of the Commissioner is reversed andremanded pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and that on remand, the Commissioner will affirm the favorable portion of the decision; direct the Administrative Law Judge to give further consideration to whether Plaintiffs seizure disorder met or equaled a listing prior to January 6, 2020; give further consideration to Plaintiffs need for an assistive device during the period prior to January 6,2020; offer Plaintiff a new hearing; take any further actionsneeded to complete the administrative record; and issue a new decision on the issue of disability prior to January 6, 2020. (Signed by Jalitza Poveda Deputy Clerk on 5/27/2022) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
17 17 order Stipulation and Order of Remand to SSA Thu 05/26 10:29 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF REMAND TO SSA. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/26/2022. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Remand to Agency Thu 05/26 9:39 AM
Consent MOTION to Remand to Agency to Social Security Administration by Kilolo Kijakazi. (McKimens, Pam)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Remand to Agency Thu 05/26 10:28 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting the parties joint motion16 to remand to the Commissioner of Social Security. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/26/2022. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 05/04 12:07 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion and Responsive Brief by Kilolo Kijakazi. (McKimens, Pam)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 05/04 12:14 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant's letter application15 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The Court adopts the parties agreed upon modified briefing schedule. By June 20, 2022 counsel shall file the complete administrative record and their fully briefed motions for judgment on the pleadings. In addition, plaintiff memorandum in support of her motion may exceed the court's page limit requirement. Counsel shall follow J. Block's motion rules, specifically section 2(D) when filing their motions. The Court does not require a courtesy copy of the motion papers and the administrative record. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/4/2022. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 02/14 1:02 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion and Memorandum of Law by Rei Corcoran. (Keller, Mark)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 02/14 1:30 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff's letter application14 with the consent of the defendant is GRANTED. The Court adopts the parties agreed upon modified briefing schedule. By May 20, 2022 counsel shall file the complete administrative record and their fully briefed motions for judgment on the pleadings. In addition, plaintiff memorandum in support of her motion may exceed the court's page limit requirement. Counsel shall follow J. Block's motion rules, specifically section 2(D) when filing their motions. The Court does not require a courtesy copy of the motion papers and the administrative record. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/14/2022. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 01/10 12:04 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion and Memorandum of Law by Rei Corcoran. (Keller, Mark)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 01/10 12:26 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff's letter application13 with the consent of the defendant is GRANTED. The Court adopts the parties agreed upon modified briefing schedule. By May 6, 2022 counsel shall file the complete administrative record and their fully briefed motions for judgment on the pleadings. Counsel shall follow J. Block's motion rules, specifically section 2(D) when filing their motions. The Court does not require a courtesy copy of the motion papers and the administrative record. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/10/2022. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
12 12 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 12/15 7:58 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Kilolo Kijakazi (McKimens, Pam)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Wed 12/15 9:34 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's letter application12 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The Court adopts the parties agreed upon briefing schedule. By April 15, 2022 counsel shall file the complete administrative record and their fully briefed motions for judgment on the pleadings. Counsel shall follow J. Block's motion rules, specifically section 2(D) when filing their motions. The Court does not require a courtesy copy of the motion papers and the administrative record. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/15/2021. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
11 11 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/18 2:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: By March 11, 2022 counsel shall file the complete administrative record and their fully briefed motions for judgment on the pleadings. Counsel shall follow J. Block's motion rules, specifically section 2(D) when filing their motions. Counsel are not required to serve a courtesy copy of the motion papers or administrative record with the court. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/18/2021. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of Transcript Administrative (Social Security Appeal) Thu 11/18 1:17 PM
Service of Transcript Administrative (Social Security Appeal) on Plaintiff's Attorney November 18, 2021 (McKimens, Pam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases Tue 11/16 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Pam McKimens on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (aty to be noticed) (McKimens, Pam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 09/21 10:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rei Corcoran. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Keller, Mark)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 09/21 10:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rei Corcoran. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 8/31/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Keller, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 08/11 3:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Galeano, Sonia)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 08/11 2:49 PM
Proposed Summons. by Rei Corcoran (Keller, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 08/05 3:27 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 08/05 1:38 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Rei Corcoran (Keller, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 08/05 1:33 PM
Proposed Summons. by Rei Corcoran (Keller, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/05 1:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14725491 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Rei Corcoran. (Keller, Mark)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/05 3:23 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Thu 08/05 3:25 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: Defendant name on the summons does not match defendant name as it appears on the complaint. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Neptune, Pierre)
Related: [-]