Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:William H Steele
Referred: William E Cassady
Case #: 1:21-cv-00348
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2021
Terminated:Jan 20, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 01, 2022 2:58 AM CST
Defendant
Meese, Inc.
Represented By
Catherine Simon Spann
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Michael C. Niemeyer
Hand Arendall
contact info
Plaintiff
Duane Ruben Carter
Represented By
Desmond V. Tobias
Tobias Mccormick And Comer, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, January 20, 2022
20 20 1 pgs order Order to Dismiss on Settlement Thu 01/20 3:35 PM
Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/20/22. (cmj)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 01/20 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Meese, Inc. (Niemeyer, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Thu 01/20 2:25 PM
REFERRAL OF19 Notice of Settlement to Judge Steele. (cmj)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
17 17 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 01/07 2:48 PM
MOTION for Catherine Simon Spann to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Meese, Inc.. (Spann, Catherine)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Fri 01/07 3:42 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:17 MOTION for Catherine Simon Spann to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (cmj)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 01/07 3:54 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Catherine Simon Spann terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/7/22. (Cassady, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
16 16 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Mon 12/06 11:26 AM
Notice of Filing Video Deposition of Plaintiff Duane Ruben Carter filed by Meese, Inc.. (Spann, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
14 14 misc Supplement to Rule 26(f) Report Thu 10/07 11:00 AM
Supplement to4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Spann, Catherine)
Related: [-]
order Order - Document NOTED Thu 10/07 10:07 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement11 filed by Meese, Inc. (Cassady, William)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 10/07 12:07 PM
Order. The agreements reached by the parties, as shown in the Supplemental Rule 26(f) Report (Doc. 14) are adopted and incorporated into the Court's Rule 16 Scheduling Order (Doc. 8). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/7/21. (Cassady, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/06 1:25 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Meese, Inc., Tingue, Brown & Co. identifying Corporate Parent Tingue, Brown & Co. for Meese, Inc... (Spann, Catherine)
Related: [-]
order Order - Document NOTED Wed 10/06 4:20 PM
Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement11 filed by Meese, Inc. (Steele, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
10 10 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Tue 10/05 5:25 PM
Notice of Filing Defendant's Initial Disclosures filed by Meese, Inc.. (Spann, Catherine)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Tue 10/05 4:50 PM
Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Duane Ruben Carter. (Tobias, Desmond)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
8 8 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/28 4:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2022 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge William H. Steele. Jury Selection set for 11/1/2022 08:45 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge William H. Steele. Discovery cutoff 4/29/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2021. Motions due by 6/1/2022. Position Regarding Settlement due by 4/29/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/28/21. (cmj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Pretrial Order
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 09/28 1:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 9/28/2021. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srd)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 09/27 10:04 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: TIME CHANGED. Scheduling Conference set, BY TELEPHONE, for 9/28/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819 (eec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
6 6 order Protective Order Tue 09/21 10:52 AM
QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/21/2021. (eec)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 09/21 10:48 AM
Order re:4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Meese, Inc., ( Scheduling Conference set, BY TELEPHONE, for 9/28/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/21/2021. (eec)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
4 4 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Mon 09/20 3:51 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Spann, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Document Referred Mon 09/20 3:53 PM
REFERRAL OF4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Cassady. (cmj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 12, 2021
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/12 9:37 AM
ANSWER to Complaint Answer to First Amended Complaint by Meese, Inc.. (Spann, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
2 2 order Preliminary Scheduling Order Fri 08/06 9:24 AM
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/20/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/6/21. (cmj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Mag
answer Answer due deadline Fri 08/06 9:19 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint due from Meese, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 81(c). (cmj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 08/05 5:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2850601, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Meese, Inc.. (Spann, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-State Court File,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Service of Process on Defendant,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Motion to Amend Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Order granting Motion to Amend Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Declaration of David Tingue,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet