Carter v. Meese, Inc.
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Steele |
Referred: | William E Cassady |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00348 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 01, 2022 2:58 AM CST |
Defendant
Meese, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Duane Ruben Carter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/20/22. (cmj) |
|
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Settlement by Meese, Inc. (Niemeyer, Michael) |
|
utility
Document Referred
Thu 01/20 2:25 PM
REFERRAL OF19 Notice of Settlement to Judge Steele. (cmj) |
||
Friday, January 07, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() MOTION for Catherine Simon Spann to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Meese, Inc.. (Spann, Catherine) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 01/07 3:42 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:17 MOTION for Catherine Simon Spann to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (cmj) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 01/07 3:54 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Catherine Simon Spann terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/7/22. (Cassady, William) |
||
Monday, December 06, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Notice of Filing Video Deposition of Plaintiff Duane Ruben Carter filed by Meese, Inc.. (Spann, Catherine) |
|
Thursday, October 07, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Supplement to4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Spann, Catherine) |
|
order
Order - Document NOTED
Thu 10/07 10:07 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement11 filed by Meese, Inc. (Cassady, William) |
||
order
Order
Thu 10/07 12:07 PM
Order. The agreements reached by the parties, as shown in the Supplemental Rule 26(f) Report (Doc. 14) are adopted and incorporated into the Court's Rule 16 Scheduling Order (Doc. 8). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/7/21. (Cassady, William) |
||
Wednesday, October 06, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Meese, Inc., Tingue, Brown & Co. identifying Corporate Parent Tingue, Brown & Co. for Meese, Inc... (Spann, Catherine) |
|
order
Order - Document NOTED
Wed 10/06 4:20 PM
Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement11 filed by Meese, Inc. (Steele, William) |
||
Tuesday, October 05, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Filing Defendant's Initial Disclosures filed by Meese, Inc.. (Spann, Catherine) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Duane Ruben Carter. (Tobias, Desmond) |
|
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2022 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge William H. Steele. Jury Selection set for 11/1/2022 08:45 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge William H. Steele. Discovery cutoff 4/29/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2021. Motions due by 6/1/2022. Position Regarding Settlement due by 4/29/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/28/21. (cmj) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 09/28 1:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 9/28/2021. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srd) |
||
Monday, September 27, 2021 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 09/27 10:04 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: TIME CHANGED. Scheduling Conference set, BY TELEPHONE, for 9/28/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819 (eec) |
||
Tuesday, September 21, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/21/2021. (eec) |
|
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 09/21 10:48 AM
Order re:4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Meese, Inc., ( Scheduling Conference set, BY TELEPHONE, for 9/28/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/21/2021. (eec) |
||
Monday, September 20, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Spann, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Document Referred
Mon 09/20 3:53 PM
REFERRAL OF4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Cassady. (cmj) |
||
Thursday, August 12, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ANSWER to Complaint Answer to First Amended Complaint by Meese, Inc.. (Spann, Catherine) |
|
Friday, August 06, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/20/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/6/21. (cmj) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
answer
Answer due deadline
Fri 08/06 9:19 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint due from Meese, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 81(c). (cmj) |
||
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2850601, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Meese, Inc.. (Spann, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |