Edgar C. Loualhati et al v. US Bank National Association
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-06285 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 29, 2022 1:45 AM PST |
Defendant
US Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Asuncion Loualhati
19632 Alyssa Drive
Santa Clarita, CA 91321 |
|
Plaintiff
Edgar C. Loualhati
19632 Alyssa Drive
Santa Clarita, CA 91321 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
![]() MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Plaintiffs, in pro per, are not present. Court confers with defense counsel. For reasons stated on the record, the Court dismisses this action without prejudice for Plaintiffs' failure to prosecute this matter, except for Count 11 which was dismissed with prejudice on October 18, 2021. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 11/18 12:50 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 11/22/2021 status conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
||
Thursday, October 28, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant US Bank National Association.(Coutts, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
![]() MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6)13 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: granting in part and denying in part13 MOTION to Dismiss. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. The Court GRANTS the motion to dismiss on all causes of action. With the exception of the eleventh cause of action, which would be dismissed with prejudice because the statute of limitations period has lapsed, all claims would be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs will have until November 12, 2021 to file a First Amended Complaint. If there is no amendment filed, the matter will be dismissed without prejudice. The Court sets a status conference for November 22, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 10/14 3:09 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 10/18/2021 Motion Hearing13 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
||
Monday, October 04, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
![]() OPPOSITION Declaration in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to to Amend Expedited Ruling Required by October 1, 2021 Pending Private Sale16 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Sale and Leave to Amend filed by Defendant US Bank National Association.(Coutts, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 29, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - RULING ON EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SALE AND LEAVE TO AMEND EXPEDITED RULING REQUIRED BY OCTOBER 1, 2021, PENDING PRIVATE SALE by Judge George H. Wu re:16 EX PARTE APPLICATION. At this time, the Court would deny the Motion without prejudice. A party seeking a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction relief must demonstrate: (see document for details). Plaintiffs have failed to make sufficient factual allegations or present evidence supporting their request, including information about the private sale which they seek to consummate, such as the closing date of the sale or whether the sale is even under contract. (See document for additional details). Accordingly, the Court DENIES the plaintiffs' Motion without prejudice. The Court also orders a response to the Motion from the defendant, due no later than October 4, 2021. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, September 27, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
![]() CERTIFICATE and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Asuncion Loualhati, Edgar C. Loualhati. (lom) |
|
Friday, September 17, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() DECLARATION of Plaintiffs in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to to Amend Expedited Ruling Required by October 1, 2021 Pending Private Sale16 filed by Plaintiffs Asuncion Loualhati, Edgar C. Loualhati. (mrgo) |
|
16 | 16
![]() EMERGENCY MOTION for Sale and Leave to Amend Expedited Ruling Required by October 1, 2021 Pending Private Sale filed by Plaintiffs Asuncion Loualhati, Edgar C. Loualhati. (et) |
|
Thursday, September 16, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant US Bank National Association, identifying US Bank National Association as Trustee.(Coutts, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) 13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): A proposed order shall be submitted as a separate attachment to the Motion or to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, September 14, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant US Bank National Association. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attorney Melissa Robbins Coutts added to party US Bank National Association(pty:dft)) (Coutts, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Edgar C. Loualhati, Asuncion Loualhati, upon Defendant US Bank National Association served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tom Johnson, Vice President in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, August 09, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL Executed by Plaintiff US Bank National Association, upon Defendant US Bank National Association served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon (no name or title) in compliance with statute not specified by mail. (mrgo) |
|
10 | 10
![]() ORDER4 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS ORDERED that the lis pendens is based on the complaint for declaratory relief, damages and quiet title and shall be issued. (iv) |
|
9 | 9
![]() STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) |
|
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
7 | 7
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant US Bank National Association. (car) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car) |
|
Monday, August 02, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF LIS PENDENS FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS filed by Asuncion Loualhati, Edgar C. Loualhati. (car) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION filed by Plaintiffs Asuncion Loualhati, Edgar C. Loualhati. (car) |
|
2 | 2
![]() EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Asuncion Loualhati, Edgar C. Loualhati. (car) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Defendant US Bank National Association. Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo.(Filing fee $ 402 FEE PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Edgar C. Loualhati, Asuncion Loualhati. (car) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |