Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-00014
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2021
Terminated:May 05, 2023
Last checked: Friday Aug 06, 2021 3:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Stefan Eberhard Zappey (1)
Represented By
Kendal Demetrius Silas
Federal Defender Program Inc.-Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Leanne Michelle Marek
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/07/2023 1:55 AM EDT
Thursday, July 22, 2021
1 1 7 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey (1). (jpk) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs MOTION to Seal Complaint by USA as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey. (jpk) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Complaint as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 7/22/2021. (jpk) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey (jpk) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
5 5 MOTION to Unseal Complaint by USA as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey. (cmd) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Unseal Complaint as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 7/23/2021. (cmd) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Kendal Demetrius Silas for Stefan Eberhard Zappey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 7/23/2021. (tcc) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey. Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing set for 7/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1879 before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (Tape #FTR) (tcc) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey. (tcc) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
10 10 Order of Temporary Detention pursuant to Bail Reform Act by Judge Alan J. Baverman as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey. Detention Hearing set for 7/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1879 before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (tcc) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs CJA 7 as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey - Order for Authorization for Distribution of Available Private Funds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 7/23/2021. c:Financial Office (tcc) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 7/27/2021 at 9:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1879 before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (lme) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman: Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey. The Defendant is in the process of retaining attorney Don Samuel and this should be completed by 7/30/2021. Preliminary hearing rescheduled to 7/30/2021 at 2:30 PM. Detention hearing rescheduled to 7/30/2021 at 2:30 PM. (Tape #FTR) (rlb) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
The preliminary & detention hearing scheduled on July 30, 2021 has been canceled as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey. Mr. Zappey is in quarantine due to exposure to COVID and per the USM will be released on August 5th. (lme) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey. Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 8/9/2021 at 2:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1879 before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Mr. Zappey will appear by video conference and the attorneys will appear in person. (lme) [3:21-mj-00002-RDC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
13 13 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey (1) count(s) 1-2. (dmb)
Related: [-]
15 15 Request for Arraignment as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey. (dmb)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs Summons Issued as to Stefan Eberhard Zappey Arraignment set for 8/13/2021 at 10:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1810 before Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (dmb)
Related: [-]